This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2020 at 13:28:30 (UTC).

Meadows Of Wickenburg Incorporated et al v. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Meadows Of Wickenburg Incorporated filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas L Rayes and Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01285

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Douglas L Rayes

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sarah Unknown

Alexandria Unknown

Jacob Unknown

The Meadows Of Wickenburg Incorporated

Nathan Unknown

Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated

Defendants

UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company

United Behavioral Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dmitry Shifrin

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Chicago, IL

150 N Riverside Plz., Ste. 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Colleen Walter

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Chicago, IL

150 N Riverside Plz., Ste. 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Eric Edward Lynch

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Colleen S Walter

Attorney at Polsinelli PC - Chicago, IL

150 N Riverside Plz., Ste. 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Matthew Kort

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP - Phoenix Office

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

John C West

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP - Phoenix Office

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#17

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#16

#15

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

#7

#6

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Stipulation: Plaintiffs shall have until September 16, 2020, to file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss #14 . Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 8/21/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion To Dismiss by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated, Alexandria Unknown, Jacob Unknown, Nathan Unknown, Sarah Unknown. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shifrin, Dmitry) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group, Inc. for United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Kort, Robert) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Case by United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kort, Robert) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The Stipulation #12 is granted. Defendants UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company and United Behavioral Health shall have until August 12, 2020, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 7/21/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kort, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Matthew Kort on behalf of United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Kort, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Colleen S Walter on behalf of Plaintiffs Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated, Alexandria Unknown, Jacob Unknown, Nathan Unknown, and Sarah Unknown. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated, Alexandria Unknown, Jacob Unknown, Nathan Unknown, Sarah Unknown: Certificate of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint for Breach of Implied Contract; ERISA Violations; Declaratory Judgment; Exhibits A-I; Civil Coversheet upon United Behavioral Health on 07/01/2020. (Shifrin, Dmitry) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated, Alexandria Unknown, Jacob Unknown, Nathan Unknown, Sarah Unknown: Certificate of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint for Breach of Implied Contract; ERISA Violations; Declaratory Judgment; Exhibits A-I; Civil Coversheet upon UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company on 07/01/2020. (Shifrin, Dmitry) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE re: Notice of Service by Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated, Alexandria Unknown, Jacob Unknown, Nathan Unknown, Sarah Unknown re: #6 Order of Recusal, #7 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shifrin, Dmitry) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Dmitry Shifrin on behalf of Plaintiffs Meadows of Wickenburg Incorporated, Alexandria Unknown, Jacob Unknown, Nathan Unknown, and Sarah Unknown. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on September 28, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 7/1/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Douglas L Rayes recused. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Steven P Logan for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-20-01285-PHX-SPL. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/30/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Alexandria Unknown, Nathan Unknown, Sarah Unknown, Jacob Unknown, The Meadows Of Wickenburg Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18427101. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01285-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by The Meadows Of Wickenburg Incorporated, Alexandria Unknown, Jacob Unknown, Nathan Unknown, Sarah Unknown. (Lynch, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18427101 filed by Sarah Unknown, The Meadows Of Wickenburg Incorporated, Jacob Unknown, Alexandria Unknown, Nathan Unknown. (Lynch, Eric) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I Part1, #11 Exhibit I Part 2, #12 Exhibit I Part 3)(SCA) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C West