This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2019 at 07:33:13 (UTC).

The Legacy Foundation v. Department Of Defense

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 The Legacy Foundation filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against Department Of Defense. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan D. Davis and Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00758

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Legacy Foundation

Defendant

Department Of Defense

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Brett Torchinsky

Attorney at Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC

45 North Hill Drive, Suite 100

Warrenton, VA 20186

Defendant Attorney

R. Trent McCotter

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (Alexandria)

2100 Jamieson Ave

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Appendix Appendix B

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Department Of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit Final Response

#11

(#11) So Ordered in re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by The Legacy Foundation. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/02/2019. (jlan) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by The Legacy Foundation (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6684154.), filed by The Legacy Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B, #3 Appendix Appendix C, #4 Appendix Appendix D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Torchinsky, Jason) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/11/2019) (jlan, ). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

6 #1

Notice

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons Department of Defense by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #4

Appendix Appendix D

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Department Of Defense. (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons Department of Justice by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Department Of Defense. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Response)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of Hearing Date set for JULY 19, 2019 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) So Ordered in re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by The Legacy Foundation. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/02/2019. (jlan) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by The Legacy Foundation (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Hearing Date set for JULY 19, 2019 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Department Of Defense. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Response)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Department Of Defense. (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Department Of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons Department of Justice by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons Department of Defense by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6684154.), filed by The Legacy Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B, #3 Appendix Appendix C, #4 Appendix Appendix D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Torchinsky, Jason) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/11/2019) (jlan, ). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less