This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2022 at 08:07:48 (UTC).

The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania v. 7 Star Logistics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against 7 Star Logistics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03067

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherilyn Peace Garnett

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania

Defendants

7 Star Logistics, Inc.

Three Countries Logistics, Inc.

Rovar Properties, Inc.

Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc.

Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A.

Miguel Rodriguez

Jorge H. Cruz

Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick P Fredette

Attorney at McCormick Barstow Sheppard Wayte and Carruth

7647 North Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Christopher Michael Ryan

Attorney at McCormick Barstow Sheppard Wayte and Carruth LLP

7647 North Fresno Street

Fresno, CA 93720

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Each Nguyen

Attorney at Laura Nguyen Law Offices

2629 Townsgate Road Suite 235

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Alisa Manasantivongs

Attorney at Flynn Delich and Wise LLP

One World Trade Center Suite 1800

Long Beach, CA 90831-1800

Erich P Wise

Attorney at Flynn Delich and Wise LLP

One World Trade Center Suite 1800

Long Beach, CA 90831-1800

Nicholas S Politis

Attorney at Flynn Delich and Wise LLP

One World Trade Center Suite 1800

Long Beach, CA 90831-1800

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint #24 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The document is accepted as filed. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than July 5, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#25

(#25) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANTS 7 Star Logistics, Inc., Rovar Properties, Inc., Three Countries Logistics, Inc..(Attorney Laura Each Nguyen added to party 7 Star Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Each Nguyen added to party Rovar Properties, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Each Nguyen added to party Three Countries Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nguyen, Laura) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#23

(#23) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-142) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Garnett, Sherilyn Peace, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03067-SPG-ASx. (aco) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc. answer now due 6/30/2022; Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. answer now due 6/30/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc.; Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc..(Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (pty:dft))(Politis, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#21

(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Three Countries Logistics, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#20

(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Rovar Properties, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

3 #7

Summons - Jorge H. Cruz

3 #6

Summons - Miguel Rodriguez

3 #4

Summons - Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc.

3 #3

Summons - Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc.

3 #2

Summons - Rovar Properties, LLC

3 #1

Summons - Three Countries Logistics, Inc.

3 #3

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit Policy

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint #24 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The document is accepted as filed. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than July 5, 2022. (iv) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANTS 7 Star Logistics, Inc., Rovar Properties, Inc., Three Countries Logistics, Inc..(Attorney Laura Each Nguyen added to party 7 Star Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Each Nguyen added to party Rovar Properties, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Each Nguyen added to party Three Countries Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nguyen, Laura) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-142) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Garnett, Sherilyn Peace, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-03067-SPG-ASx. (aco) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc. answer now due 6/30/2022; Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. answer now due 6/30/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc.; Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc..(Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (pty:dft))(Politis, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Three Countries Logistics, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Rovar Properties, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Miguel Rodriguez. (iv) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A. (iv) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (iv) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Chassis Management, #2 Summons - Jorge H. Cruz, #3 Summons - Flexi-Van Leasing, #4 Summons - Mediterranean Shipping Company, #5 Summons - Miguel Rodriguez, #6 Summons - Rovar Properties, #7 Summons - Three Countries Logistics)(Fredette, Patrick) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. The document(s) should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs.. (sh) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania, identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc.. (Fredette, Patrick) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Three Countries Logistics, Inc., #2 Summons - Rovar Properties, LLC, #3 Summons - Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc., #4 Summons - Chassis Management Services Southern California, Inc., #5 Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A., #6 Summons - Miguel Rodriguez, #7 Summons - Jorge H. Cruz)(Fredette, Patrick) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy)(Fredette, Patrick) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33253820 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Patrick P Fredette added to party The Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania(pty:pla))(Fredette, Patrick) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THREE COUNTRIES LOGISTICS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHASSIS MANAGEMENT SERVICES SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where 7 STAR LOGISTICS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY USA INC. is a litigant