This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 07:18:47 (UTC).

The Huntington National Bank v. Matthew Alan Holdings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 The Huntington National Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Matthew Alan Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07905

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Huntington National Bank

Defendants

Matthew Alan Holdings, LLC

Neil A. Rago

Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC

Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Assn.

Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Association

Orland Park Business Center Office Complex

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Reel Delehanty

Attorney at Stahl Cowen

55 West Monroe, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60603

Andrew H. Eres

Attorney at Stahl, Cowen, Crowley, Addis LLC

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60603

Ronald A. Damashek

Attorney at Stahl, Cowen, Crowley, Addis LLC

55 West Monroe Street, Suite1200

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Ronald A. Damashek (Damashek, Ronald) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank as to Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Association on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank as to Neil A. Rago on 12/7/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion to appoint receiver #10 is granted. The Court appoints Matthew D. Brash as the Receiver of the Property with all powers and authority as prescribed by the IMFL. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#1

(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Huntington National Bank re complaint #1 , civil cover sheet #2 (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank as to Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC on 1/5/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Status hearing set for 2/4/2020 is stricken and reset to 2/25/2020 at 9:30 AM for a hearing on approval of the Receiver first report. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/17/2019: Mailed notice(rj, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Huntington National Bank re complaint #1 , civil cover sheet #2 (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Andrew H. Eres (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Joseph Reel Delehanty (Delehanty, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

No Description Available

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE of Service and Notice of Mailing by Andrew H. Eres on behalf of The Huntington National Bank regarding order, terminate hearings, set/reset hearings #16 (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#18

(#18) RECEIVER'S BOND in the amount of $ 5,000 posted. (Document not scanned). (pk, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Huntington National Bank re complaint #1 , civil cover sheet #2 (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank as to Matthew Alan Holdings, LLC on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank to appoint receiver (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM by The Huntington National Bank in support of motion to appoint receiver #10 (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank as to Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC on 1/5/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RECEIVER'S BOND in the amount of $ 5,000 posted. (Document not scanned). (pk, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CERTIFICATE of Service and Notice of Mailing by Andrew H. Eres on behalf of The Huntington National Bank regarding order, terminate hearings, set/reset hearings #16 (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Status hearing set for 2/4/2020 is stricken and reset to 2/25/2020 at 9:30 AM for a hearing on approval of the Receiver first report. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/17/2019: Mailed notice(rj, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion to appoint receiver #10 is granted. The Court appoints Matthew D. Brash as the Receiver of the Property with all powers and authority as prescribed by the IMFL. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank as to Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Association on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank as to Neil A. Rago on 12/7/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Huntington National Bank as to Matthew Alan Holdings, LLC on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM by The Huntington National Bank in support of motion to appoint receiver #10 (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank to appoint receiver (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 2/4/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/28/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Gatlin Rago CPA Group LLC, Matthew Alan Holdings, LLC, Orland Park Business Center Office Complex Association, Neil A. Rago (kl, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Joseph Reel Delehanty (Delehanty, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Ronald A. Damashek (Damashek, Ronald) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Huntington National Bank by Andrew H. Eres (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Huntington National Bank re complaint #1 , civil cover sheet #2 (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Foreclosure and Other Relief filed by The Huntington National Bank; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16491372.(Eres, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.