This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:19:17 (UTC).

The Housing Group Real Estate Inc. v. Williams

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 The Housing Group Real Estate Inc filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Amy Totenberg and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05487

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Housing Group Real Estate Inc.

W. Lanier Ave.

Fayetteville, GA 30214

Defendant

Lachelle Williams

Jonesboro, GA 30238

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal: The Court RECOMMENDS that the action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/9/19. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER adopting the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the opinion of this Court. For the reasons stated in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, the Court REMANDS this case to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. There being no further issues before the Court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/10/19. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Lachelle Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Correspondence to Clayton County Magistrate Court Clerk re #5 Remand Order (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#7

(#7) Mail sent to The Housing Group Real Estate Inc. re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order, and #5 Order returned as undeliverable. Marked: RTS; Insufficient Address; Unable to Forward. (No Alternate Address Found) (bnp) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/9/19. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail sent to The Housing Group Real Estate Inc. re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order, and #5 Order returned as undeliverable. Marked: RTS; Insufficient Address; Unable to Forward. (No Alternate Address Found) (bnp) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Clayton County Magistrate Clerk re #5 Order and #6 Correspondence. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Correspondence to Clayton County Magistrate Court Clerk re #5 Remand Order (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to The Housing Group Real Estate Inc., Lachelle Williams re #5 Order. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER adopting the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the opinion of this Court. For the reasons stated in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, the Court REMANDS this case to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. There being no further issues before the Court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 12/10/19. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to The Housing Group Real Estate Inc., Lachelle Williams re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/9/19. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for purposes of this action only. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/9/19 within the #3 R&R. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal: The Court RECOMMENDS that the action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/9/19. (bnp) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Lachelle Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lachelle Williams. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.