This case was last updated from PACER on 12/23/2019 at 07:59:02 (UTC).

The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. v. Savello, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Savello, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candy W. Dale and Stephen R Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00414

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Candy W. Dale

Stephen R Bough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Savello, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Edward A Lawson

Attorney at LAWSON & LASKI

675 Sun Valley Road, Suite A

Ketchum, ID 83340

Cody Lynn Morgan

Attorney at Perkins, Mitchell, Pope & McAllister

Po Box 519

Boise, ID 83701-0519

Katie Franklin

Attorney at Lawson Laski Clark & Pogue, PLLC

675 Sun Valley Road, Ste. A, Po Box 3310

Ketchum, ID 83340

Bruce R McAllister

Attorney at Carey Perkins LLP

Po Box 519

Boise, ID 83701-0519

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Thomas E. Dvorak

Attorney at GIVENS PURSLEY LLP

601 West Bannock Street

Boise, ID 83702

Jack Widener Relf

Attorney at Givens Pursley LLP

601 W. Bannock Street

Boise, ID 83702

Thomas E Dvorak

Attorney at GIVENS PURSLEY

Po Box 2720

Boise, ID 83701-2720

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Bruce R McAllister appearing for Counter Defendant The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (McAllister, Bruce)

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal and Answer and Counterclaim filed by The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Replies due by 12/31/2019.(Lawson, Edward)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. Notice of Association as Counsel of Counter-defendant the Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. (McAllister, Bruce)

12 #3

Memorandum in Support

12 #2

Exhibit B - Amended Answer and Counterclaim

12 #1

Exhibit A - Amended Notice of Removal

#12

(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal and Answer and Counterclaim Jack Widener Relf appearing for Defendant Savello, LLC, Counter Claimant Savello, LLC. Responses due by 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Relf, Jack)

10 #1

Memorandum in Support

#10

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Savello, LLC. Replies due by 12/19/2019.(Relf, Jack)

3 #3

State Court Service Documents

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

State Court Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Savello, LLC and counsel for The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/24/2019. (jd)

1 #4

Answer and Counterclaim

1 #3

Exhibit to Dvorak Declaration

1 #2

Declaration of Thomas E. Dvorak

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#3) SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Savello, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Register of Action. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Service Documents)(Dvorak, Thomas)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • (#19) TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum on Motion to Dismiss Count 2 of Counterclaim. (Doc. #18). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Plaintiff/Counterdefendant The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. is granted an extension of time until and including December 27, 2019, to file its reply. Signed by Judge Stephen R Bough. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (tld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Bruce R McAllister appearing for Counter Defendant The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (McAllister, Bruce)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF CASE NUMBER CHANGE. This case has been reassigned to Judge Stephen R Bough. Please use case number 1:19-cv-00414-SRB on all future pleadings. (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • (#17) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Stephen R Bough from the Western District of Missouri. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal and Answer and Counterclaim filed by The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Replies due by 12/31/2019.(Lawson, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE by The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. Notice of Association as Counsel of Counter-defendant the Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. (McAllister, Bruce)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc..Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/11/2019.(Lawson, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Savello, LLC. Replies due by 12/19/2019.(Relf, Jack)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal and Answer and Counterclaim Jack Widener Relf appearing for Defendant Savello, LLC, Counter Claimant Savello, LLC. Responses due by 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Answer and Counterclaim, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Relf, Jack)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Savello, LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John C Hansen, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John C. Hansen, #3 Declaration of Katherine Vogeleheim, #4 Declaration of Robert Underwood)(Relf, Jack)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • (#8) A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE. (jd) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court Edward A Lawson appearing for Counter Defendant The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc., Plaintiff The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc.. Responses due by 11/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Lawson, Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on January 8, 2020, at 11:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before January 2, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • (#5) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. by Savello, LLC.(Dvorak, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Savello, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Register of Action. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Service Documents)(Dvorak, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Savello, LLC and counsel for The Hemingways Condominium Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/24/2019. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The state court documents were filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal and properly titled the document name. The filing party shall re-submit their exhibits as supplement and link them to the Notice of Removal. The answer that you attached to the Notice of Removal doesn't appear to have been filed in the state court, therefore it should have it's own docket entry and not be attached as an exhibit. Please refile the answer.(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Savello, LLC from Blaine County District Court, case number CV07-19-00571.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1959573.), filed by Savello, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Thomas E. Dvorak, #3 Exhibit to Dvorak Declaration, #4 Answer and Counterclaim)(Dvorak, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less