This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:41:10 (UTC).

The Healing Chair, Inc. v. Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 The Healing Chair, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Logan, Logan Watson, L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Welby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00327

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Welby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Healing Chair, Inc.

Defendants

Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.

Andrew V Logan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jill R. Rembusch

Defendant Attorney

Steven H. Schwartz

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition (ECF No. 4) is GRANTED. Plaintiff has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff chooses not to file an amended complaint, this matter will be DISMISSED, without prejudice. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 5/31/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on May 10, 2022. (MCB) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response to Motion, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff The Healing Chair, Inc.. (Rembusch, Jill) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#9

(#9) FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C., Plaintiff The Healing Chair, Inc.. (KJS) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE Notice of Removal executed by State Court: by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

6 #8

Exhibit H

6 #7

Exhibit G

6 #4

Exhibit D

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #6

Main Document

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

1 #4

Original Filing Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Full State Court File

1 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's State Court Petition

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition (ECF No. 4) is GRANTED. Plaintiff has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff chooses not to file an amended complaint, this matter will be DISMISSED, without prejudice. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 5/31/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on May 10, 2022. (MCB) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time #11 is GRANTED. Defendants' reply brief is due no later than April 18, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 04/11/22. (MCC) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response to Motion, #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff The Healing Chair, Inc.. (Rembusch, Jill) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C., Plaintiff The Healing Chair, Inc.. (KJS) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Notice of Removal executed by State Court: by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docket(#7) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BAK) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by The Healing Chair, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(BAK) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE Removal to Eastern District of Missouri: by Defendants Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C. re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Packet)(Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 22SL-CC01008, with receipt number AMOEDC-9193314, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Andrew V Logan, Logan, Logan & Watson, L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Full State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less