This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 10:26:27 (UTC).

The Harford Mutual Insurance Company v. iMedia Brands, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 The Harford Mutual Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against iMedia Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02713

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Harford Mutual Insurance Company

Carriage Hill Associates

Carriage Hill Assc LP

Defendants

iMedia Brands, Inc. f/n/a Evine Live Inc. formerly known as Evine Live Inc. doing business as Evine doing business as evine.com

Evine Live Inc.

Swagway, LLC

Hoverzon, LLC doing business as Swagtron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert D Anbinder

Po Box 65354

Baltimore, MD 21209

Christopher Konzelmann

Attorney at White and Williams LLP

1650 Market St One Liberty Place Ste. 1800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew T Angotti

Attorney at Anderson Coe and King LLP

Seven St. Paul Street, Suite 1600

Baltimore, MD 21202-1653

Ariana K DeJan-Lenoir

Attorney at Anderson, Coe & King, LLP

Seven St. Paul Street, Suite 1600

Baltimore, MD 21202

Ralph L Arnsdorf

Attorney at Franklin and Prokopik

Two N Charles St Ste 600

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

32 #2

Text of Proposed Order

32 #1

Memorandum in Support

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

25 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#25

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Summons Summons to Swagway

1 #2

Summons Summons to Imedia

1 #1

Summons Summons to Hoverzon

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Corrected MOTION to Vacate Default by Swagway, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnsdorf, Ralph) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hoverzon, LLC re #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading and contest jurisdiction Corrected Certificate of Service (Arnsdorf, Ralph) Modified on 11/5/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CORRECTED NOTICE by Hoverzon, LLC Special Appearance to Contest Jurisdiction (Arnsdorf, Ralph) Modified on 11/5/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CORRECTED NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph L Arnsdorf on behalf of Swagway, LLC (Arnsdorf, Ralph) Modified on 11/5/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Swagway, LLC (Arnsdorf, Ralph) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hoverzon, LLC (Arnsdorf, Ralph) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/4/2020. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading and contest jurisdiction by Hoverzon, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Arnsdorf, Ralph) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Swagway, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/4/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Vacate Default by Swagway, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnsdorf, Ralph) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Konzelmann. Directing attorney Christopher Konzelmann to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Konzelmann (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8889136.) by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company(Anbinder, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. Swagway, LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020.(Anbinder, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company. Hoverzon, LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020.(Anbinder, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Hoverzon, LLC, Swagway, LLC, iMedia Brands, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Second Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Anbinder, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #1 Complaint, Writ of Summons to IMEDIA BRANDS (Anbinder, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Harford Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Harford Mutual Insurance Company for The Harford Mutual Insurance Company.(Anbinder, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Harford Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8870898.), filed by Harford Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Hoverzon, #2 Summons Summons to Imedia, #3 Summons Summons to Swagway)(Anbinder, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less