This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 14:57:33 (UTC).

The Guarantee Company of North America USA v. Steed General Contractors, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 The Guarantee Company of North America USA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Steed General Contractors, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03246

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Guarantee Company of North America USA

Defendants

Teresa Papastefanou

Steed General Contractors, Inc.

Delphi Painting & Decorating Co., Inc.

Edith Papastefanou

Irene Kaselis

Christopher Papastefanou

John Kaselis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Christian Delaney

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP (Morristown)

1300 Mount Kemble Ave., P.O. Box 2075

Morristown, NJ 07962-2075

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, August 6, 2021 at 3:15 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/14/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#17

(#17) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Irene Kaselis..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#16

(#16) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Kaselis..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#15

(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teresa Papastefanou..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#14

(#14) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Papastefanou..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#13

(#13) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edith Papastefanou..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#12

(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Delphi Painting & Decorating Co., Inc...(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#11

(#11) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steed General Contractors, Inc...(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Irene Kaselis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Kaselis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steed General Contractors, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intact Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc. for The Guarantee Company of North America USA. Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, August 6, 2021 at 3:15 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/14/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Irene Kaselis..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Kaselis..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teresa Papastefanou..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Papastefanou..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edith Papastefanou..(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Delphi Painting & Decorating Co., Inc...(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steed General Contractors, Inc...(dnh) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Irene Kaselis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Kaselis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steed General Contractors, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Christian Delaney. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: all defendants. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (gp) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney he Guarantee Company of North America USA. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intact Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Intact Insurance Group USA Holdings, Inc. for The Guarantee Company of North America USA. Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA..(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Christopher Papastefanou, Delphi Painting & Decorating Co., Inc., Irene Kaselis, John Kaselis, Edith Papastefanou, Teresa Papastefanou, Steed General Contractors, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24419734)Document filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint).(Delaney, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Christian Delaney to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/20/2021. (gp) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Christian Delaney