This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2019 at 07:48:54 (UTC).

The Ground Guys LLC v. PBC Landscaping LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 The Ground Guys LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PBC Landscaping LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00431

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Ground Guys LLC

Defendants

PBC Landscaping LLC

Vicki Norton

Norton Ventures LLC

Brian Norton

Brian Andrew Norton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R. Dunnam

Attorney at Dunnam, Dunnam, etal

4125 W. Waco Dr., P.O. Box 8418

Waco, TX 76714-8418

Andrea Michelle Mehta

Attorney at Dunnam & Dunnam, LLP

4125 West Waco Drive

Waco, TX 76710

Defendant Attorney

Christopher J. Schwegmann

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER, (Mediation Conference set for 10/9/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Plaintiff and its counsel shall arrive at the mediation at no later than 8:30 a.m.. While Defendants and their counsel shall arrive at no later than 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 9/24/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 8/27/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Mediation by The Ground Guys LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Dunnam, James) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

4 #3

Proposed Order

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by The Ground Guys LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Dunnam, James) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#3

(#3) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f): Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2019 01:45 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#2

(#2) APPENDIX to #1 Notice of Removal, by Brian Norton, Vicki Norton, Norton Ventures LLC, PBC Landscaping LLC. (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

1 #2

Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PBC Landscaping LLC, Vicki Norton, Brian Norton, Norton Ventures LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12374233), filed by PBC Landscaping LLC, Vicki Norton, Brian Norton, Norton Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske: Pretrial Conference held on 9/4/2019. Case called for Initial Pretrial Scheduling and Discovery Conference. The Court set a telephonic statusconference 9/12 at 3 p.m. to verify that anything that needed to be produced has been and that parties are set for the mediation. The Court discussed the mediation process. The Court asked that if there are gong to be cross claims that the defendant let the plaintiff know prior to mediation. The Court also ordered the plaintiff to provide the defendant a viable damage model with demand at least 5 days prior to the mediation. Mediation briefs are due by October 2. The Court also stated that ex parte communications prior to the mediation are allowed with the communication being by e-mail to the Law Clerk - Kyle_Gardner@txwd.uscourts.gov. The Order commencing deadlines will be in effect on November 4, 2019 - after mediation. The plaintiff's motion is protected during this time. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR.)(am) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 9/12/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, (Mediation Conference set for 10/9/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Plaintiff and its counsel shall arrive at the mediation at no later than 8:30 a.m.. While Defendants and their counsel shall arrive at no later than 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 9/24/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske: Telephone Conference held on 8/27/2019. CASE CALLED FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. PARTIES ARE INTERESTED IN HAVING MEDIATION. THE COURT SET 10/10 TENTATIVELY AS THE MEDIATION DATE WITH A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE BEING HELD PRIOR TO THAT (9/24) TO MAKE SURE ALL IS WELL. IF PARTIES ARE NOT AVAILABLE FOR 10/10 MEDIATION THEY NEED TO LET THE LAW CLERK KNOW BY 4:30 TODAY AND THE MEDIATION WILL BE HELD 10/9 INSTEAD. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.)(lad) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 8/27/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Noting the agreement of the parties, the Court STAYS this case until November 1, 2019 for alternative dispute resolution. All pending deadlines are subject to this stay. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mdjm) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Mediation by The Ground Guys LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Dunnam, James) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by The Ground Guys LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Dunnam, James) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f): Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2019 01:45 PM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (am) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPENDIX to #1 Notice of Removal, by Brian Norton, Vicki Norton, Norton Ventures LLC, PBC Landscaping LLC. (Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PBC Landscaping LLC, Vicki Norton, Brian Norton, Norton Ventures LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12374233), filed by PBC Landscaping LLC, Vicki Norton, Brian Norton, Norton Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Grounds Guys, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J Schwegmann