This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2022 at 18:13:23 (UTC).

The Gray Casualty & Surety Company v. TGX Logistics Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 The Gray Casualty Surety Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TGX Logistics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03377

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Gray Casualty & Surety Company

Defendants

T Bancshares Inc

TGX Logistics Inc

AJ Transportation LLC

Aladdin Financial Inc

Alexander Winton & Associates Inc

All Ways Auto Transport LLC doing business as AW Transport

Alpha Interstate Transport Inc

AM2PM Transport

AMA Logistics Inc

APH Quality Transport LLC

APL Cargo Inc

Asquare Freight Inc

Atlas and Avion Carrier Solutions LLC

Balkan Express LLC

Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc.

Bayer Trans Inc

BC Factoring LLC doing business as Bridge Capital Business Service

Best Friends Logistics Inc

Better Trucking LLC

108 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven K Cannon

Attorney at Krebs Farley & Dry PLLC

909 18Th Street

Plano, TX 75074

James David Ewing

Attorney at Krebs Farley & Dry PLLC

909 18Th Street

Plano, TX 75074

Thomas Scott Leo

Attorney at The Law Offices of T. Scott Leo, P.C.

100 North Lasalle Street, 514

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan R. Ksiazek

Attorney at Robbins DiMonte, Ltd.

216 Higgins Road

Park Ridge, IL 60068

Riccardo Anthony DiMonte

Attorney at Robbins DiMonte, Ltd.

216 West Higgins Road

Park Ridge, IL 60068

David Justin Dale

Attorney at Staub Anderson LLC

55 W. Monroe, Suite 1925

Chicago, IL 60603

Other Attorneys

Fedor Kozlov

Attorney at The Law Offices of Fedor Kozlov, P.C.

1990 E. Algonquin Rd, Suite 230

Schaumburg, IL 60173

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) ORDER Granting Motion for Substituted Service Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 10/19/2022. Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

37 #42

Text of Proposed Order

37 #39

Exhibit

37 #38

Exhibit

37 #37

Exhibit

37 #31

Exhibit

37 #19

Exhibit

37 #16

Exhibit

37 #3

Exhibit

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Designation of Local Counsel filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bonanza Investment LLC (khg, ) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER Granting Motion for Substituted Service Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 10/19/2022. Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On the grounds set forth in the motion, plaintiff's motion for substituted service #37 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The plaintiff's motion for substituted service #37 is taken under advisement. The plaintiff is directed to submit a proposed order, in Word format, to the Court's proposed order inbox (Proposed_Order_Tharp@ilnd.uscourts.gov). Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Docket(#38) ENTRY MADE IN ERROR. (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION by Plaintiff The Gray Casualty & Surety CompanySubstituted Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) AFFIDAVIT of Chicago Tribune regarding order #29 (Linked document has the incorrect case number.) (Cannon, Steven) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 10/3/2022) (lxk, ). (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to Complaint by Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc.(Dale, David) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Alexander Winton & Associates Inc(Ksiazek, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Baxter Bailey & Associates, Inc. by David Justin Dale (Dale, David) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James David Ewing on behalf of The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ewing, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Union Trans, #2 Summons - Union Diesel, #3 Universal Ways, #4 Summons - US National, #5 Summons - US Transportation, #6 Summons - W&D, #7 Summons - Warriors, #8 Summons - WEX, #9 Summons - Y. Castillo, #10 Summons - YLM, #11 Summons - ZM Transport, #12 Summons - ZM Trucking) (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Shama, #2 Summons - Sherland, #3 Summons - Smart Navigator, #4 Summons - SMH, #5 Summons - Southway, #6 Summons - SPM, #7 Summons - Summar, #8 Summons - Super Service, #9 Summons - Syrway, #10 Summons - T. Bancshares, #11 Summons - Taino, #12 Summons - Tana, #13 Summons - Tetra, #14 Summons - TGX, #15 Summons - Thunder, #16 Summons - TJSL, #17 Summons - Top Line, #18 Summons - Transcredit, #19 Summons - Transational, #20 Summons - Treadstone, #21 Summons - TRU, #22 Summons - Turon) (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Jarrell, #2 Summons - Jot, #3 Summons - JRD, #4 Summons - Majewski, #5 Summons - Mercury, #6 Summons - Miljanovic, #7 Summons - MJ, #8 Summons - Muzom, #9 Summons - Navigation, #10 Summons - Neighbors, #11 Summons - Oak Hill, #12 Summons - One Golden Way, #13 Summons - Overseas, #14 Summons - Phoenix, #15 Summons - Quality Logistics, #16 Summons - Quick, #17 Summons - Remick, #18 Summons - RG, #19 Summons - Rise, #20 Summons - RPM, #21 Summons - RTS) (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - FJ Trucking, #2 Summons - FHK, #3 Summons - First Bank, #4 Summons - FleetOne, #5 Summons - Forsage, #6 Summons - Franck, #7 Summons - Freight Dispatch, #8 Summons - GH Factor, #9 Summons - Globe, #10 Summons - Goldway, #11 Summons - Ground Express, #12 Summons - GTS, #13 Summons - Gulfstream, #14 Summons - H&L, #15 Summons - HB, #16 Summons - Hero, #17 Summons - High Power, #18 Summons - Highway Hauling, #19 Summons - HK, #20 Summons - I&I, #21 Summons - Interland) (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - CD Consort., #2 Summons - CDC, #3 Summons - CFS, #4 Summons - CH Logistics, #5 Summons - Compass Funding, #6 Summons - Compass United, #7 Summons - Confianca, #8 Summons - Connect Freight, #9 Summons - Constellation, #10 Summons - CoreLogic, #11 Summons - Dallas Trucking, #12 Summons - Dirre, #13 Summons - DM, #14 Summons - Deamers, #15 Summons - Eagle, #16 Summons - eCapital, #17 Summons - ED Express, #18 Summons - Ed's, #19 Summons - Efficient Trucking, #20 Summons - Emmanuel, #21 Summons - EMR, #22 Summons - Eshon, #23 Summons - Express Freight) (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Aladdin, #2 Summons - All Ways, #3 Summons - Alpha, #4 Summons - AM2PM, #5 Summons - AMA, #6 Summons - APH, #7 Summons - APL, #8 Summons - Asquire, #9 Summons - Atlas, #10 Summons - AWA, #11 Summons - Balkan, #12 Summons - Bayer, #13 Summons - BBA, #14 Summons - BC Factoring, #15 Summons - Best Friends, #16 Summons - Better Trucking, #17 Summons - BIH, #18 Summons - Bisson, #19 Summons - Bonanza, #20 Summons - BR, #21 Summons - BSL) (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Designation of Local Counsel filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Cannon, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by The Gray Casualty & Surety Company. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12912903) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Cannon, Steven) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/23/2022) (jmg). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BALKAN EXPRESS LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT is a litigant