This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2020 at 12:17:08 (UTC).

The First State Bank v. Peoples Bank

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 The First State Bank filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Peoples Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George C. Smith and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00492

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C. Smith

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The First State Bank

Defendant

Peoples Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron E. McQueen

Attorney at Jackson Kelly PLLC

50 S. Main Street, Suite 201

Akron, OH 44308

Clay Kenneth Keller

Attorney at Jackson Kelly PLLC

50 South Main Street, Suite 201

Akron, OH 44308

Mark W. Bernlohr

Attorney at Jackson Kelly PLLC

50 S. Main Street, Suite 201

Akron, OH 44308

Defendant Attorney

Brian Patrick Nally

Attorney at Reminger

101 West Prospect Avenue, Suite 1400

Cleveland, OH 44115

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons Form

#3

2 #3

Exhibit C - Fossil Coal v. Peoples Bank Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit B - Mark Pinson Affidavit

2 #1

Exhibit A - Participation Agreement

#2

1 #4

Exhibit C - Fossil Coal v. Peoples Bank Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B - Mark Pinson Affidavit

1 #2

Exhibit A - Participation Agreement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2020 @ 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines per #7 Stipulated Extension of Time to Move Or Plead filed on 03/26/2020: Peoples Bank answer due 4/15/2020. (mdr) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Peoples Bank. (Nally, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Peoples Bank. Peoples Bank served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (McQueen, Aaron) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Peoples Bank. (mdr) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Clay Kenneth Keller for Plaintiff The First State Bank (Keller, Clay) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (McQueen, Aaron) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff The First State Bank re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Participation Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Mark Pinson Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Fossil Coal v. Peoples Bank Complaint) (McQueen, Aaron) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Peoples Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7303376), filed by The First State Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Participation Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Mark Pinson Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - Fossil Coal v. Peoples Bank Complaint) (McQueen, Aaron) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/29/2020) (sem). (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/29/2020) (sem). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/29/2020) (sem). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peoples Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where First State Bank of Brownsboro is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P. Nally