This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2023 at 09:26:41 (UTC).

The Estate of Xavier Veliz et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 The Estate of Xavier Veliz filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01726

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE ESTATE OF XAVIER VELIZ

XAVIER K. VELIZ

JENNY D. VELIZ

R.D. Veliz

Defendant

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

E. Dubois Raynor, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

Brian Peter Scibetta

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint for extension of time to respond through May 23, 2023 by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT , FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, filed by Jenny D. Veliz, The Estate of Xavier Veliz, Xavier K. Veliz, R.D. Veliz. (Raynor, E.) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#13

(#13) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for proposed Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) and (b)(6) by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER withdrawing #8 emergency application for injunctive relief by Order to show cause; ORDER TO ANSWER Nationstar's time to respond to complaint due 4/14/2023. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/17/2023 ) (RG) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION re #8 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Order to Show Cause,, Stipulation withdrawing emergency application, acknowledging service, and designating response deadline by National Mortgage, LLC (Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Peter Scibetta on behalf of National Mortgage, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant or attorneys for the Defendant, appear and show cause by video conference on March 22, 2023, at 5 oclock in the afternoon why an order should not be issued pursuant to FRCP 65 providing the following relief: enjoining defendant from conducting a foreclosure sale during pending of this litigation. Express mail service of a copy of this order shall be made on or before the 16th of March, 2023. See Order for complete details. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/15/2023. (PW) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

8 #7

Exhibit Plaintiffs' Supporting Affidavit

8 #6

Exhibit Ex. 4 - Defendant's Notice of Nonjudicial Foreclosure Sale for Marc

8 #5

Exhibit Ex. 3 - Defendants' Belated Supreme Court Default Response

8 #4

Exhibit Ex. 2 - February 6, 2023, Order of Queens County Supreme Court

8 #3

Exhibit Ex. 1 Underlying Complaint

8 #2

Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order

8 #1

Affidavit Counsel's Emergency Affirmation In Support Of Plaintiffs' Ap

#8

(#8) First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by R.D. Veliz, The Estate of Xavier Veliz, Jenny D. Veliz, Xavier K. Veliz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Counsel's Emergency Affirmation In Support Of Plaintiffs' Application For An Order To Show Cause, #2 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 Underlying Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 - February 6, 2023, Order of Queens County Supreme Court, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Defendants' Belated Supreme Court Default Response, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Defendant's Notice of Nonjudicial Foreclosure Sale for March 27, 2023, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Supporting Affidavit) (Raynor, E.) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 4/19/2023 at 10:30 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 1726#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/8/2023. (PW) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

2 #2

Exhibit Counsel's Certificate of Good Standing

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16476325. by THE ESTATE OF XAVIER VELIZ, JENNY D. VELIZ, R. D. VELIZ, XAVIER K. VELIZ. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Counsel's Affidavit In Support of Pro Hac Application, #2 Exhibit Counsel's Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Raynor, E.) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint for extension of time to respond through May 23, 2023 by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT , FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, filed by Jenny D. Veliz, The Estate of Xavier Veliz, Xavier K. Veliz, R.D. Veliz. (Raynor, E.) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER denying as unnecesary #13 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The premotion conference is waived. This letter motion is deemed to constitute defendant's motion to dismiss on the grounds stated. Plaintiffs' opposition due 5/2/2023. However, if plaintiffs intend to file an amended complaint, they must do so by 4/25/2023. In light of this briefing schedule, the Initial Status Conference scheduled for tomorrow 4/19/2023 is CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/18/2023. (PW) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for proposed Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) and (b)(6) by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER withdrawing #8 emergency application for injunctive relief by Order to show cause; ORDER TO ANSWER Nationstar's time to respond to complaint due 4/14/2023. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/17/2023 ) (RG) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STIPULATION re #8 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 Order to Show Cause,, Stipulation withdrawing emergency application, acknowledging service, and designating response deadline by National Mortgage, LLC (Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Peter Scibetta on behalf of National Mortgage, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Scibetta, Brian) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant or attorneys for the Defendant, appear and show cause by video conference on March 22, 2023, at 5 oclock in the afternoon why an order should not be issued pursuant to FRCP 65 providing the following relief: enjoining defendant from conducting a foreclosure sale during pending of this litigation. Express mail service of a copy of this order shall be made on or before the 16th of March, 2023. See Order for complete details. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/15/2023. (PW) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by R.D. Veliz, The Estate of Xavier Veliz, Jenny D. Veliz, Xavier K. Veliz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Counsel's Emergency Affirmation In Support Of Plaintiffs' Application For An Order To Show Cause, #2 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 Underlying Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 - February 6, 2023, Order of Queens County Supreme Court, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Defendants' Belated Supreme Court Default Response, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Defendant's Notice of Nonjudicial Foreclosure Sale for March 27, 2023, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Supporting Affidavit) (Raynor, E.) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 4/19/2023 at 10:30 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 1726#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/8/2023. (PW) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER granting #2 Earl D Raynor Jr. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/8/2023. (PW) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to National Mortgage, LLC. (KD) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Letter to Clerk of the Court by THE ESTATE OF XAVIER VELIZ, JENNY D. VELIZ, R. D. VELIZ, XAVIER K. VELIZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emergency Application And Proposed Order In Need Of Submission) (Raynor, E.) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16476325. by THE ESTATE OF XAVIER VELIZ, JENNY D. VELIZ, R. D. VELIZ, XAVIER K. VELIZ. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Counsel's Affidavit In Support of Pro Hac Application, #2 Exhibit Counsel's Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Raynor, E.) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC d/b/a MR. COOPER filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16471289 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by JENNY D. VELIZ, THE ESTATE OF XAVIER VELIZ, XAVIER K. VELIZ, R. D. VELIZ. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons for Issuance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Case Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Letter Notice of Pending Application for Regular Admission) (Raynor, E.) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less