This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:59:41 (UTC).

The Estate of Thomas Doheny et al v. The County of McHenry et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 The Estate of Thomas Doheny filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The County of McHenry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa A. Jensen and Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-50138

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisa A. Jensen

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elizabeth Doheny

Caitlin Doheny

Megan Doheny

The Estate of Thomas Doheny

John Doheny

Gerald Doheny

Defendants

Correctional Officers 1-12

The McHenry County Correctional Facility

Bill Prim

The County of McHenry

Unknown Correctional Officers 1-12

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas William Gooch, III

Attorney at Wysocki & Gooch

209 South Main Street

Wauconda, IL 60084

Defendant Attorneys

Jana E. Blake Dickson

Attorney at Mchenry County State's Attorney

2200 N. Seminary Ave

Woodstock, IL 60098

George Michael Hoffman

Attorney at McHenry County State's Attorney

2200 N. Seminary Avenue

Woodstock, IL 60098

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE by Caitlin Doheny re amended document #19 (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#19

(#19) AMENDED Second Amended Complaint (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #16 is granted in part. Plaintiffs shall file the amended complaint by 6/09/2020. Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint by 6/23/2020. Defendants' motion to dismiss #7 is denied as moot. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE by Caitlin Doheny re MOTION by Plaintiff Caitlin Doheny to amend/correct Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #16 (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION by Plaintiff Caitlin Doheny to amend/correct Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The Court adopts parties proposed briefing schedule #13 on Defendants' motion to dismiss #7 as follows: Plaintiffs' response due 6/01/2020; Defendants' reply by 6/15/2020. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#13

(#13) Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by The County of McHenry (Hoffman, George) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#7

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The Court adopts parties proposed briefing schedule #13 on Defendants' motion to dismiss #7 as follows: Plaintiffs' response due 6/01/2020; Defendants' reply by 6/15/2020. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020. Mailed notice (jp, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McHenry County, McHenry County Correctional Center, Bill Prim by Jana E. Blake Dickson (Blake Dickson, Jana) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McHenry County, McHenry County Correctional Center, Bill Prim by George Michael Hoffman (Hoffman, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hoffman, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A-E

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, case number (19LA367) filed by McHenry County, McHenry County Correctional Center, Bill Prim Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16942791. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Hoffman, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Caitlin Doheny re amended document #19 (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED Second Amended Complaint (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #16 is granted in part. Plaintiffs shall file the amended complaint by 6/09/2020. Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint by 6/23/2020. Defendants' motion to dismiss #7 is denied as moot. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Caitlin Doheny re MOTION by Plaintiff Caitlin Doheny to amend/correct Leave to File Second Amended Complaint #16 (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by Plaintiff Caitlin Doheny to amend/correct Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The Court adopts parties proposed briefing schedule #13 on Defendants' motion to dismiss #7 as follows: Plaintiffs' response due 6/01/2020; Defendants' reply by 6/15/2020. Mailed notice (jk, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by The County of McHenry (Hoffman, George) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Caitlin Doheny, Elizabeth Doheny, Gerald Doheny, John Doheny, Megan Doheny, The Estate of Thomas Doheny by Charles Jeffrey Thut (Thut, Charles) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Bill Prim, The County of McHenry, The McHenry County Correctional Facility (Hoffman, George) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMAILED notice of removal letter to counsel for plaintiffs. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020. Mailed notice (jp, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McHenry County, McHenry County Correctional Center, Bill Prim by Jana E. Blake Dickson (Blake Dickson, Jana) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McHenry County, McHenry County Correctional Center, Bill Prim by George Michael Hoffman (Hoffman, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hoffman, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, case number (19LA367) filed by McHenry County, McHenry County Correctional Center, Bill Prim Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16942791. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Hoffman, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Michael Hoffman