This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:15:03 (UTC).

The Estate of Melanie DeCrane et al v. Tenke

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 The Estate of Melanie DeCrane filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Tenke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan P. Watters. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00113

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Estate of Melanie DeCrane

Mellie DeCrane

Defendant

Justin Tenke

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald D. Sommerfeld

Attorney at TOWE BALL ENRIGHT MACKEY & SOMMERFELD

2525 Sixth Avenue North

Billings, MT 59101

Defendant Attorneys

Randall G. Nelson

Attorney at NELSON LAW FIRM, P.C.

2619 St. Johns Avenue, Suite E

Billings, MT 59102

Thomas C. Bancroft

Attorney at NELSON LAW FIRM, P.C.

2619 St. Johns Avenue, Suite E

Billings, MT 59102

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support, #6 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support filed by The Estate of Melanie DeCrane. (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

9 #5

Affidavit of Justin Tenke

9 #4

Exhibit C - Crow Tribal Court's Dismissal

9 #3

Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service

9 #2

Exhibit A - Email with Big Horn County state district court complaints

9 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Randall G. Nelson

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mellie DeCrane. (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#7

(#7) FILER HAS REFILED CORRECTED DOCUMENT AS ENTRY 8 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff Mellie DeCrane (Sommerfeld, Donald) Modified on 12/2/2021 (AMC). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#6

(#6) FILER HAS REFILED CORRECTED DOCUMENT AS ENTRY 8 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff Mellie DeCrane (Sommerfeld, Donald) Modified on 12/2/2021 (AMC). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff Mellie DeCrane (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Justin Tenke. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Justin Tenke. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#2

(#2) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/21/2022. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/14/2022. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/21/2022. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/8/2021. (EMH) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - September 22, 2020 letter from Donald Sommerfeld

1 #1

Exhibit A - Justin Tenke Affidavit

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support, #6 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support filed by The Estate of Melanie DeCrane. (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Justin Tenke. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Randall G. Nelson, #2 Exhibit A - Email with Big Horn County state district court complaints, #3 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Crow Tribal Court's Dismissal, #5 Affidavit of Justin Tenke) (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: re #7 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support, #6 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used and pdf attached. Clerk will term motions 6-7 to clean up the motions report, filer has re-filed the correct document. (AMC) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mellie DeCrane. (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILER HAS REFILED CORRECTED DOCUMENT AS ENTRY 8 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff Mellie DeCrane (Sommerfeld, Donald) Modified on 12/2/2021 (AMC). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILER HAS REFILED CORRECTED DOCUMENT AS ENTRY 8 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff Mellie DeCrane (Sommerfeld, Donald) Modified on 12/2/2021 (AMC). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff Mellie DeCrane (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Justin Tenke. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Justin Tenke. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/21/2022. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/14/2022. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/21/2022. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 11/8/2021. (EMH) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketFiling fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-2762475 (AMC) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL- CASE NUMBER IS CV-21-113-BLG-SPW by Justin Tenke from Big Horn County District Court, case number DV-2021-13, filed by Justin Tenke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Justin Tenke Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - September 22, 2020 letter from Donald Sommerfeld, #3 Exhibit C - November 1, 2021 letter from Donald Sommerfeld, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas C. Bancroft

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall G. Nelson