This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:47:09 (UTC).

The Estate of Laura Wickliffe v. Target Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 The Estate of Laura Wickliffe filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Estate of Laura Wickliffe

Defendants

Target

Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC

Target Corporation

Prudential Life Insurance Agency, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gavin Michael Richard

Attorney at The Law Office of Gavin M. Richard, LLC

8550 United Plaza Blvd., Ste. 702

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant Attorneys

Alia S. Wynne

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Milam Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Julie Melissa Kamps

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Alnisa Bell

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) NOTICE AND ORDER: The #26 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, filed by Gavin M. Richard is set for a hearing on Thursday, March 31, 2022 at 10:00 AM via Zoom. Participant instructions are attached. The appearance of Plaintiff The Estate of Laura Wickliffe (Derrick Woods and Jamie Wickliffe) and Gavin M. Richard, are required at the hearing. Counsel of record for Plaintiff The Estate of Laura Wickliffe (Derrick Woods and Jamie Wickliffe) shall advise them of this Order and provide the participant instructions. Any party or counsel who does not have video web conferencing capabilities must contact the Court at (225) 389-3584 immediately to make other arrangements. Failure to attend the scheduled hearing may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/22/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

26 #3

Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1A

26 #2

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

26 #1

Affidavit Withdrawing Attorney's Affidavit Per Rule 83

26 #26

Main Document

24 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order For Motion to Withdraw

24 #24

Main Document

22 #1

Exhibit - Proposed Order

22 #22

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/25/2022. (ELW) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC.. (Wynne, Alia) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Record

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Parish of East Baton Rouge 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-714449. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2387227), filed by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Wynne, Alia) Modified on 2/1/2022 to substitute notice of removal as per Order #10 (LLH). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice to Counsel: In light of the #26 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, filed by Gavin M. Richard the scheduling conference set for 3/31/2022 is CANCELED. No status report is due at this time. The court will reset the scheduling conference to a later date upon resolution of the Motion to Withdraw. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE AND ORDER: The #26 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, filed by Gavin M. Richard is set for a hearing on Thursday, March 31, 2022 at 10:00 AM via Zoom. Participant instructions are attached. The appearance of Plaintiff The Estate of Laura Wickliffe (Derrick Woods and Jamie Wickliffe) and Gavin M. Richard, are required at the hearing. Counsel of record for Plaintiff The Estate of Laura Wickliffe (Derrick Woods and Jamie Wickliffe) shall advise them of this Order and provide the participant instructions. Any party or counsel who does not have video web conferencing capabilities must contact the Court at (225) 389-3584 immediately to make other arrangements. Failure to attend the scheduled hearing may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/22/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #26 Second MOTION for Gavin M. Richard to Withdraw as Attorney Ex Parte. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Second MOTION for Gavin M. Richard to Withdraw as Attorney Ex Parte by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Withdrawing Attorney's Affidavit Per Rule 83, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1A)(Richard, Gavin) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER denying without prejudice the #24 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record ("Motion") for failure to comply with Local Rule 83(b)(13). The Motion does not contain a certification by counsel that the client has been notified of all deadlines and pending court appearances. Additionally, the Certificate of Service appears to be for a "Memorandum in Opposition" not the said Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 First MOTION for Gavin M. Richard to Withdraw as Attorney Of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) First MOTION for Gavin M. Richard to Withdraw as Attorney Of Record by The Estate of Laura Wickliffe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order For Motion to Withdraw)(Richard, Gavin) (Entered: 03/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER: The #22 Defendants' Consent Motion for Leave to Appear at the Scheduling Conference Via Telephone is GRANTED for good cause shown. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scheduling Conference, if needed, is CONVERTED to a Telephone Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/4/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear At The Scheduling Conference Via Telephone . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear At The Scheduling Conference Via Telephone by Prudential Life Insurance Agency, LLC, Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Order)(Kamps, Julie) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Defendant Target Corporation. The Motion, which seeks a twenty-one days extension to respond to Plaintiff's Petition, states that it is unopposed. Additionally, the requirements for an extension under Local Civil Rule 7(a) are met. Defendant Target Corporation's responsive pleadings to the Petition for Damages (R. Doc. 1-2, pp. 5-6) due 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/29/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 01/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Answer Or Otherwise Respond. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EWD) (Entered: 01/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Substitute Record Document No. 1 by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (Notice of Removal Revised Case Caption), #2 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Wynne, Alia) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Answer Or Otherwise Respond by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wynne, Alia) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF Appearance of Alia Wynne On Behalf of Target Corporation by Target Corporation (Wynne, Alia) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America under Local Civil Rule 7(a). Responsive pleadings for The Prudential Insurance Company of America to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages (R. Doc. 1-2, pp. 5-6) due 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/27/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Wynne, Alia) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/25/2022. (ELW) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC.. (Wynne, Alia) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Parish of East Baton Rouge 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-714449. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2387227), filed by Prudential Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Wynne, Alia) Modified on 2/1/2022 to substitute notice of removal as per Order #10 (LLH). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prudential Life Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alia S. Wynne