This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2021 at 12:21:43 (UTC).

The Estate of Joseph P. King et al v. Ward et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 The Estate of Joseph P King filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ward. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. McAvoy and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-01413

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. McAvoy

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amy King

The Estate of Joseph P. King

Defendants

Hal Meyers

Anthony Annucci

Joseph Ward

Marie T. Sullivan

John Does Corrections Officers (1-10, fictitious individuals)

Jami Palladino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank R. Schirripa

Attorney at Hach & Rose, LLP

112 Madison Avenue, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Keith Altman

Attorney at The Law Office of Keith Altman

33228 West 12 Mile Road, Ste 375

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #4

Summons issued as to Sullivan

2 #3

Summons issued as to Annucci

2 #1

Summons issued as to Palladino

#2

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Hal Meyers. (nas, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Issued as to Joseph Ward. (nas, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Re- Issued as to Marie T. Sullivan. (nas, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Re-Issued as to Jami Palladino. (nas, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Re- Issued as to Anthony Annucci. (nas, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Amy King, The Estate of Joseph P. King is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Amy King, The Estate of Joseph P. King is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Amy King, The Estate of Joseph P. King is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Amy King, The Estate of Joseph P. King is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Amy King, The Estate of Joseph P. King is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Altman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Altman, Keith) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (meb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party The Estate of Joseph P. King, Amy King; Attorney D. Scott Wiggins, Email address is dswiggins@lentolawgroup.com. Phone number is 856-652-2000. Admissions due by 12/1/2020. (Served on attorney via email)(meb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party The Estate of Joseph P. King, Amy King; Attorney Keith Altman, Email address is kaltman@lawampmmt.com. Phone number is 516-456-5885. Admissions due by 12/1/2020. (Sent to attorney via email)(meb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/10/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Joseph Ward. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Palladino, #2 Summons issued as to Meyers, #3 Summons issued as to Annucci, #4 Summons issued as to Sullivan)(meb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Anthony Annucci, John Does Corrections Officers (1-10, fictitious individuals), Hal Meyers, Jami Palladino, Marie T. Sullivan, Joseph Ward (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5318418) filed by The Estate of Joseph P. King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(meb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank R. Schirripa