This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:13:17 (UTC).

The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand v. Tenke

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Tenke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand

Defendant

Justin Tenke

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald D. Sommerfeld

Attorney at TOWE BALL ENRIGHT MACKEY & SOMMERFELD

2525 Sixth Avenue North

Billings, MT 59101

Defendant Attorney

Randall G. Nelson

Attorney at NELSON LAW FIRM, P.C.

2619 St. Johns Avenue, Suite E

Billings, MT 59102

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support, #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand. (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

8 #5

Affidavit of Justin Tenke

8 #4

Exhibit C - Crow Tribal Court's Dismissal

8 #3

Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service

8 #2

Exhibit A - Email with Big Horn County state district court complaints

8 #1

Affidavit of Randall G. Nelson

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT Brief in Support Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Sommerfeld, Donald) Modified on 12/2/2021 to term motion and clean up text (AMC). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#5

(#5) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Justin Tenke. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 11/23/2021. (JLE) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#3

(#3) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/4/2022. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/4/2022. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/4/2022. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/9/2021. (JLE) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Justin Tenke. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - November 1, 2021 letter from Donald Sommerfeld

1 #2

Exhibit B - September 22, 2020 letter from Donald Sommerfeld

1 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Justin Tenke

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support, #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand. (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Justin Tenke. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Randall G. Nelson, #2 Exhibit A - Email with Big Horn County state district court complaints, #3 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Crow Tribal Court's Dismissal, #5 Affidavit of Justin Tenke) (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: re #7 MOTION to Remand Brief in Support. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. Clerk will go in and term motion 7 to clean up the motions report. Filer does NOT have to refile. (AMC) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT Brief in Support Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Sommerfeld, Donald) Modified on 12/2/2021 to term motion and clean up text (AMC). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court Donald D. Sommerfeld appearing for Plaintiff The Estate of Darrell Duane Lefthand Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Sommerfeld, Donald) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Justin Tenke. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 11/23/2021. (JLE) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/4/2022. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/4/2022. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/4/2022. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 11/9/2021. (JLE) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Justin Tenke. (Nelson, Randall) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AMTDC-2762492 (JDH) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Justin Tenke from MT 22nd Judicial District Court, case number DV 2021-14. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Justin Tenke, #2 Exhibit B - September 22, 2020 letter from Donald Sommerfeld, #3 Exhibit C - November 1, 2021 letter from Donald Sommerfeld, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDH) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall G. Nelson