This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:21:42 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO et al v. CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are James B. Clark and John Michael Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17148

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

Presiding Judge

John Michael Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO AND MARITZA CLARK AND ERIC FRIAS, AS ADMINISTRATORS AD PROSEQUENDUM FOR THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO

THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO AND MARITZA CLARK AND ERIC FRIAS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JOHN DOE JAIL PERSONNEL AND/OR CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-5 (FICTITIOUS INDIVIDUALS) IN THEIR OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES

RONALD P. EDWARDS

CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC

SAMONTE SOFRADO

COUNTY OF HUDSON, NEW JERSEY

HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER

JOHN DOE HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 1-5, (FICTITIOUS INDIVIDUALS) IN THEIR OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES

DOROTHEA KALINISAN

DR. FRANK SANTOS

HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER

JOHN DOE JAIL PERSONNEL AND/OR CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-5

JOHN DOE HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 1-5

Defendant and Cross Claimant

HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LORNE M. REITER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LORNE M. REITER, LLC

124 First Avenue

Atlantic Highlands, NJ 07716

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STEPHEN D. HOLTZMAN

Attorney at HOLTZMAN & MCCLAIN, PC

524 Maple Avenue, Suite 200

Linwood, NJ 08221

PATRICK J. CLARE

Attorney at CLARE & SCOTT, LLC

22 Church Street, P.O. Box 17

Liberty Corner, NJ 07938

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

PATRICK J. CLARE

Attorney at CLARE & SCOTT, LLC

22 Church Street, P.O. Box 17

Liberty Corner, NJ 07938

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, COUNTY OF HUDSON, NEW JERSEY, RONALD P. EDWARDS, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER, HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER, JOHN DOE HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 1-5, (FICTITIOUS INDIVIDUALS) IN THEIR OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, JOHN DOE JAIL PERSONNEL AND/OR CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-5 (FICTITIOUS INDIVIDUALS) IN THEIR OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, DOROTHEA KALINISAN, DR. FRANK SANTOS, SAMONTE SOFRADO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916233) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO AND MARITZA CLARK AND ERIC FRIAS, AS ADMINISTRATORS AD PROSEQUENDUM FOR THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO.(REITER, LORNE) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Separate Defenses, Demand for Allocation of Fault, Designation of Trial Counsel and Certification of E-Filing and Service by CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, SAMONTE SOFRADO.(HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO AND MARITZA CLARK AND ERIC FRIAS, AS ADMINISTRATORS AD PROSEQUENDUM FOR THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO civil cover sheet (REITER, LORNE) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER. (CLARE, PATRICK) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#4

(#4) Hackensack Meridian Health Palisades Medical Center ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, COUNTY OF HUDSON, NEW JERSEY, RONALD P. EDWARDS, HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER, JOHN DOE HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 1-5, JOHN DOE JAIL PERSONNEL AND/OR CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-5, DOROTHEA KALINISAN, DR. FRANK SANTOS, SAMONTE SOFRADO by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER.(CLARE, PATRICK) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC. (HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, COUNTY OF HUDSON, NEW JERSEY, RONALD P. EDWARDS, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER, HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER, DOROTHEA KALINISAN, DR. FRANK SANTOS, SAMONTE SOFRADO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC. (HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Separate Defenses, Demand for Allocation of Fault, Designation of Trial Counsel and Certification of E-Filing and Service by CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, SAMONTE SOFRADO.(HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER. (CLARE, PATRICK) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Hackensack Meridian Health Palisades Medical Center ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, COUNTY OF HUDSON, NEW JERSEY, RONALD P. EDWARDS, HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER, JOHN DOE HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 1-5, JOHN DOE JAIL PERSONNEL AND/OR CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-5, DOROTHEA KALINISAN, DR. FRANK SANTOS, SAMONTE SOFRADO by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER.(CLARE, PATRICK) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, COUNTY OF HUDSON, NEW JERSEY, RONALD P. EDWARDS, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER, HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER, DOROTHEA KALINISAN, DR. FRANK SANTOS, SAMONTE SOFRADO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO AND MARITZA CLARK AND ERIC FRIAS, AS ADMINISTRATORS AD PROSEQUENDUM FOR THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO civil cover sheet (REITER, LORNE) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, COUNTY OF HUDSON, NEW JERSEY, RONALD P. EDWARDS, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN PALISADES MEDICAL CENTER, HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER, JOHN DOE HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS 1-5, (FICTITIOUS INDIVIDUALS) IN THEIR OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, JOHN DOE JAIL PERSONNEL AND/OR CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 1-5 (FICTITIOUS INDIVIDUALS) IN THEIR OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES, DOROTHEA KALINISAN, DR. FRANK SANTOS, SAMONTE SOFRADO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916233) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO AND MARITZA CLARK AND ERIC FRIAS, AS ADMINISTRATORS AD PROSEQUENDUM FOR THE ESTATE OF CARLOS BORROTO.(REITER, LORNE) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.