This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2020 at 05:58:34 (UTC).

The Dent Guys, Inc. v. Pitts

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 The Dent Guys, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Pitts. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03822

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Dent Guys, Inc.

Defendant

Terry Pitts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Lilenfeld

Attorney at Lilenfeld, P.C.

Suite 980, 3379 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

Robin L. Gentry

Attorney at Lilenfeld PC

3379 Peachtree Road, Ste 980

Atlanta, GA 30326

Kennington Groff

Attorney at Lilenfeld, P.C.

Suite 980, 3379 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SEVENTH ORDER IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#6

(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Terry Pitts. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by The Dent Guys, Inc. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

4 #3

Text of Proposed Order

4 #2

Declaration of Kennington R. Groff

4 #1

Brief

#4

(#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by The Dent Guys, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support, #2 Declaration of Kennington R. Groff, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE Of Filing Verification by The Dent Guys, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#2

(#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10145478) filed by The Dent Guys, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2020: #2 Exhibit 1) (kt). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEVENTH ORDER IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/16/20. (TWT) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Terry Pitts. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by The Dent Guys, Inc. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by The Dent Guys, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support, #2 Declaration of Kennington R. Groff, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Of Filing Verification by The Dent Guys, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10145478) filed by The Dent Guys, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2020: #2 Exhibit 1) (kt). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less