This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 07:04:25 (UTC).

County of Tuscarawas, Ohio et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 County of Tuscarawas, Ohio filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45098

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt plc

The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.

Jane Does 1-50

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance

Cephalon, Inc.

CVS Health Corporation

CVS Indiana L.L.C.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Ohio CVS Stores, LLC

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Insys Therapeutics

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Vincent I. Holzhall

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Mark H. Lynch

Attorney at Covington & Burling - Washington

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Carole S. Rendon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joseph F. Murray

Attorney at Murray, Murphy, Moul & Basil

1114 Dublin Road

Columbus, OH 43215

Gregory J. Phillips

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff - Cleveland

2300 Bp Tower, 200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Sandra K. Zerrusen

Attorney at Jackson Kelly - Akron

50 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

Other Attorneys

Hunter G. Cavell

Attorney at Buckley King - Cleveland

1400 Fifth Third Center, 600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joshua E. O'Farrell

Attorney at Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Canton

4277 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

Linda J. Singer

Attorney at Motley Rice - Washington

401 Ninth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Donald W. Davis, Jr.

Attorney at Brennan, Manna & Diamond - Akron

75 East Market Street

Akron, OH 44308

Ryan D. Styer

Attorney at Styer & Styer

114 East High Avenue

New Philadelphia, OH 44663

Jude B. Streb

Attorney at Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Canton

4277 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

Lee E. Plakas

Attorney at Tzangas, Plakas & Mannos

8Th Floor, 220 Market Avenue, S

Canton, OH 44702

Brent M. Buckley

Attorney at Buckley King - Cleveland

1400 Fifth Third Center, 600 Superior Avenue, E

Cleveland, OH 44114

Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr

Attorney at Bartlit Beck - Chicago

54 West Hubbard Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Lisa M. Saltzburg

Attorney at Motley Rice - Mount Pleasant

17Th Floor, 28 Bridgeside Blvd.

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Service Papers

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/20/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Totowa LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Discount Drug Mart, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saltzburg, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance Notice of Appearance by Linda J. Singer filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Singer, Linda) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Stipulation Service Stipulation filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #3 .(Singer, Linda) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.; Richard S. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; Actavis Totowa LLC; Allergan Inc.; Actavis Kadian LLC; Actavis South Atlantic LLC; Actavis Elizabeth LLC; Allergan Finance, LLC; Allergan Sales, LLC; Allergan USA, Inc.; Warner Chilcott Company, LLC; Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC; Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.; Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.; CVS TN Distribution, LLC; CVS RX Services, Inc.; Omnicare Distribution Center LLC; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.; Walmart Pharmacy Warehouse #46; Walmart Pharmacy Warehouse #45; Walmart Pharmacy Warehouse; Discount Drug Mart, Inc.. Filed by State of Ohio, County of Tuscarawas, Ohio, Ryan Styer. (Singer, Linda) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas, Tuscarawas County, Ohio, case number 2019 CT 01 0064 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9170763. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-2804. Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Service Papers, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket) (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio CVS Stores, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Indiana L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant