This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:44:28 (UTC).

The Continental Insurance Company et al v. Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 The Continental Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Bobby Wolford Trucking Salvage Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01341

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Continental Insurance Company

Continental Casualty Company

American Casualty Company of Reading, PA

American Casualty Company of Reading PA

Defendants

Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage, Inc.

Robert C. Wolford

The City of Bothell

HWA Geosciences Inc.

Great West Casualty Company

Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc

Robert C Wolford

City of Bothell

HWA Geosciences Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew C Erickson

Attorney at NICOLL BLACK & FEIG PLLC

1325 Fourth Avenue Ste 1650

Seattle, WA 98101

Curt H Feig

Attorney at NICOLL BLACK & FEIG PLLC

1325 Fourth Avenue Ste 1650

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Schoeggl

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98101-2375

Michael Mackenzie Brown

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC (SEA)

1420 Fifth Ave Ste 4200Po Box 91302

Seattle, WA 98101-2375

Gregory L Harper

Attorney at HARPER HAYES PLLC

One Union Square600 University St Ste 2420

Seattle, WA 98101

Thomas M. Williams

Attorney at HARPER HAYES PLLC

One Union Square600 University St Ste 2420

Seattle, WA 98101

Ken Lederman

Attorney at MCCULLOUGH HILL LEARY, PS

701 Fifth Avenue, Ste 6600

Seattle, WA 98104

Samantha K Pitsch

Attorney at GORDON TILDEN THOMAS & CORDELL

600 University Stste 2915

Seattle, WA 98101

Susannah Carr

Attorney at GORDON TILDEN THOMAS & CORDELL LLP

600 University Street, Ste 2915

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc (Harper, Gregory) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory L Harper on behalf of Defendants Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc, Robert C Wolford. (Harper, Gregory) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#14

(#14) MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, an extension of time for the Initial Disclosure Deadline and FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is granted. The Initial Disclosure Deadline will be 12/13/21, and the FRCP 26(f) deadline is 12/6/21. The Joint Status report report will be due on 12/13/2021. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Susannah Carr on behalf of Defendant City of Bothell. (Carr, Susannah) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/29/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Robert C Wolford mailed on 10/8/2021 (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc mailed on 10/8/2021 (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant City of Bothell mailed on 10/8/2021 (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Great West Casualty Company mailed on 10/8/2021 (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ken Lederman on behalf of Defendant City of Bothell. (Lederman, Ken) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Continental Casualty Company (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for American Casualty Company of Reading PA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Casualty Company of Reading PA (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for The Continental Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Continental Insurance Company (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David M. Schoeggl on behalf of Defendant Great West Casualty Company. (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

2 #4

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Main Document

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc (Harper, Gregory) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory L Harper on behalf of Defendants Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc, Robert C Wolford. (Harper, Gregory) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, an extension of time for the Initial Disclosure Deadline and FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is granted. The Initial Disclosure Deadline will be 12/13/21, and the FRCP 26(f) deadline is 12/6/21. The Joint Status report report will be due on 12/13/2021. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Susannah Carr on behalf of Defendant City of Bothell. (Carr, Susannah) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/29/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Robert C Wolford mailed on 10/8/2021 (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc mailed on 10/8/2021 (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant City of Bothell mailed on 10/8/2021 (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Great West Casualty Company mailed on 10/8/2021 (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ken Lederman on behalf of Defendant City of Bothell. (Lederman, Ken) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Continental Casualty Company (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for American Casualty Company of Reading PA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Casualty Company of Reading PA (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation for The Continental Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Continental Insurance Company (Feig, Curt) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David M. Schoeggl on behalf of Defendant Great West Casualty Company. (Schoeggl, David) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s)The Continental Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, and American Casualty of Reading, PA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/12/2021. (RE) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage Inc, City of Bothell, Great West Casualty Company, HWA Geosciences Inc, Robert C Wolford. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(RE) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant(s) HWA Geosciences Inc., Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, The City of Bothell, Robert C. Wolford (Receipt # AWAWDC-7273919) Attorney Curt H Feig added to party American Casualty Company of Reading, PA (pty:pla), Attorney Curt H Feig added to party Continental Casualty Company(pty:pla), Attorney Curt H Feig added to party The Continental Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by The Continental Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, American Casualty Company of Reading, PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Summons Bobby Wolford Trucking & Salvage, Inc., #13 Summons Robert C. Wolford, #14 Summons City of Bothell, #15 Summons HWA Geosciences, Inc., #16 Summons Great West Casualty Company)(Feig, Curt) (Attachment 1 replaced to replace malformed PDF on 10/1/2021) (STP). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania is a litigant

Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant