This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2021 at 08:23:19 (UTC).

The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc. et al v. Raffensperger et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Raffensperger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01728

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc.

Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited

Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc.

Faith in Action Network

First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated

Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc.

The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc.

Mijente, Inc.

The Justice Initiative, Inc.

Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc.

Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc.

Defendants

Brad Raffensperger

Anh Le

Rebecca Sullivan

David Worley

Matthew Mashburn

Intervenor Defendants

National Republican Congressional Committee

National Republican Senatorial Committee

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jorge Luis Vasquez

Attorney at LatinoJustice PRLDEF

P.O. Box 10115, 475 Riverside Drive, Suite 1901

New York, NY 10115

Esperanza Segarra

Attorney at DarrowEverett LLP - NY

450 Seventh Ave

New York, NY 10123

Clifford Zatz

Attorney at Crowell & Moring

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Gilda Rae Williams

Attorney at Advancement Project

1220 L Street Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20005

Kurt G. Kastorf

Attorney at Kastorf Law, LLC

1387 Iverson Street Ne, Suite 100

Atlanta, GA 30307

Jess Unger

Attorney at Advancement Project

1220 L Street Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20005

Britton Dale Davis

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Nkechi Kanu

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

William Tucker

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Warrington S. Parker, III

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLC - SF CA

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Judith Browne Dianis

Attorney at Advancement Project

1220 L Street Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20005

Sabrina S. Khan

Attorney at Advancement Project

1220 L Street Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20005

Chahira Solh

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP - I CA

3 Park Plaza, 20Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan Francis Jacoutot

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Bryan P. Tyson

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Loree Anne Paradise

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Cameron T. Norris

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

1600 Wilson Blvd., Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

William Bradley Carver

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

Steven Christopher Begakis

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy PLLC -VA

Suite 700, 3033 Wilson Blvd.

Arlington, VA 22209

William Dowdy White

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith PC

191 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

RESTRICTED

#40

#39

#38

#37

#8

#7

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #2

Proposed Answer

3 #1

Memo in Support of Motion to Intervene

#3

#2

1 #2

Proposed Summons -5

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Initial Disclosures by Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc..(Kastorf, Kurt) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) APPLICATION for Admission of William Tucker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11068026).by Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., Faith in Action Network, First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc., Greater Works Ministries Network, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Mijente, Inc., New Birth Missionary Baptist Church, Inc.. (Kastorf, Kurt) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) without prejudice as to plaintiff New Birth Missionary Baptist Church, Inc. (bdb) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by New Birth Missionary Baptist Church, Inc. (Kastorf, Kurt) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee and Georgia Republican Party, Inc.'s (Proposed Intervenors) #3 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. The Court finds that permissive intervention is appropriate because Plaintiffs did not contest that Proposed Intervenors' defenses share a common question of law or fact with the current action, and allowing Proposed Intervenors to join the action at this early stage of the litigation will not cause undue delay or burden. Additionally, while the Court agrees that intervention will require the plaintiffs and the Court to devote additional resources to this action, the Court finds that the significant interests at stake militate in favor of permitting Proposed Intervenors to join the litigation and notes that any doubt concerning the propriety of allowing intervention is resolved in favor of Proposed Intervenors. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add Proposed Intervenors as defendants in this action. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/21/21. (bnw) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Certificate of Interested Persons by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Paradise, Loree Anne) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Jacoutot, Bryan) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Anh Le, Matthew Mashburn, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca Sullivan, David Worley (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #34 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexandra Nkechi Kanu Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11029788). to attorney for correction regarding courts. (nmb) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Sabrina Khan. Clerk to follow-up by 5/17/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Britton Davis. Clerk to follow-up by 5/17/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jess Unger. Clerk to follow-up by 5/17/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Clifford Zatz. Clerk to follow-up by 5/17/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Cameron T. Norris Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10953372).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler R. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10953343).by Georgia Republican Party, Inc., National Republican Congressional Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Intervene by Republican National Committee, National Republican Senatorial Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, Georgia Republican Party, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Answer)(Carver, William) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to All Plaintiffs. re #2 Order. (Order sent to Attorney Gilda R. Daniels) (eop) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/9/21. (eop) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Greater Works Ministeries Network, Inc., The Justice Initiative, Inc., Exousia Lighthouse International C.M., Inc., The Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, Inc., First Congregational Church, United Church of Christ Incorporated, New Birth Missionary Baptist Church, Inc., Samuel Dewitt Proctor Conference, Inc., Metropolitan Atlanta Baptist Ministers Union, Inc., Faith in Action Network, Georgia Latino Alliance for Human Rights, Inc. and Sankofa United Church of Christ Limited. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10929681) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Incorrect Proposed Summons -5)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 4/28/2021 (eop). (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Bradley Carver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Thomas Norris