This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:50:30 (UTC).

The Complaint of SEBAGO MARINE LEASING, LLC as Owner of a 1993 Custom catamaran vessel bearing Hull Identification No. WMR60001J393, its Engines, Tackle, Appurtenances, Equipment, & Etc

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 The Complaint of SEBAGO MARINE LEASING, LLC as Owner of a 1993 Custom catamaran vessel bearing Hull Identification No WMR60001J393, its Engines, Tackle, Appurtenances, Equipment, Etc was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-10058

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The Complaint of SEBAGO MARINE LEASING, LLC as Owner of a 1993 Custom catamaran vessel bearing Hull Identification No. WMR60001J393, its Engines, Tackle, Appurtenances, Equipment, & Etc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Evan S. Gutwein

Attorney at Hamilton Miller & Birthisel

150 Se 2Nd Avenue, Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Filing Fee transferred to 4:19-cv-10060 in the amount of $400.00 on 05/09/2019 re 1 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (mua) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • (#1) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Amount $400.00, receipt #113C-11571448, case filed date: 4/18/2019. No further entries will be made on this case. (jua) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less