This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 07:02:43 (UTC).

The Clorox Company v. Colemerg Products LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 The Clorox Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Colemerg Products LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alex G. Tse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00855

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Clorox Company

Defendants

Colemerg Products LLC

Mehmet Tepe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan T. Bricker

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend and Stockton LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gia L. Cincone

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gregory S. Gilchrist

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Clorox Company.. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/31/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Colemerg Products LLC, Mehmet Tepe. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by The Clorox Company (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15529081.). Filed byThe Clorox Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Clorox Company.. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/31/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Colemerg Products LLC, Mehmet Tepe. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/17/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by The Clorox Company (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15529081.). Filed byThe Clorox Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bricker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CLOROX COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gia L. Cincone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan T. Bricker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory S. Gilchrist