This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 08:05:47 (UTC).

The City of Bessemer, Alabama v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 The City of Bessemer, Alabama filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci G Cornelius. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00162

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci G Cornelius

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The City of Bessemer, Alabama

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc

Allergan PLC

Actavis Pharma Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation

Cardinal Health Inc

McKesson Corporation

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc

Cephalon Inc

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc

Janssen Pharmaceuticals

Acatavis plc

Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc

Noramco Inc

Watson Laboratories Inc

Actavis LLC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roderick J Evans

Attorney at WALLACE JORDAN RATLIFF & BRANDT LLC

800 Shades Crest Road, Ste. 400

Birmingham, AL 35209

Kimberly R West

Attorney at WALLACE JORDAN RATLIFF & BRANDT LLC

P.O. Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

R Shan Paden

Attorney at PADEN & PADEN

5 Riverchase Ridge, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35244

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Indivior Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, filed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama.(AKD) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Indivior Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. Mailed certified mail. (AKD) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama. Actavis LLC served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Actavis Pharma Inc. served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Allergan PLC served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Cephalon Inc served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Watson Laboratories Inc served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; CVS Health Corporation served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Cardinal Health Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Noramco Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama. Indivior Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; McKesson Corporation served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama. Johnson & Johnson served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022 (no date on green card); Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022 (no date on green card). (AKD) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL No. 2804; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 02/28/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#9

(#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by The City of Bessemer, Alabama as to Allergan PLC. (AKD) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#10

(#10) Summons Returned Unexecuted by The City of Bessemer, Alabama as to Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals Inc. (AKD) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#11

(#11) Summons Returned Unexecuted by The City of Bessemer, Alabama as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. (AKD) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Returned Unexecuted by The City of Bessemer, Alabama as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. (AKD) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Returned Unexecuted by The City of Bessemer, Alabama as to Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals Inc. (AKD) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by The City of Bessemer, Alabama as to Allergan PLC. (AKD) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL No. 2804; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 02/28/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama. Johnson & Johnson served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022 (no date on green card); Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022 (no date on green card). (AKD) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama. Indivior Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; McKesson Corporation served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; CVS Health Corporation served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Cardinal Health Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Noramco Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama. Actavis LLC served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Actavis Pharma Inc. served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Allergan PLC served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Cephalon Inc served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Watson Laboratories Inc served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022; Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Indivior Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. Mailed certified mail. (AKD) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601118414 (AKD) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Indivior Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc f/k/a Actavis Inc, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, filed by The City of Bessemer, Alabama.(AKD) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Noramco Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant