This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 10:58:44 (UTC).

The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company v. Polewski

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Polewski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela Pepper and Stephen C Dries. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00156

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Pamela Pepper

Stephen C Dries

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company

Defendant

Mary Clare Polewski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie L Dykeman

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

250 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorneys

Vanessa K Eisenmann

Attorney at Biskupic & Jacobs SC

1045 W Glen Oaks Ln - Ste 106

Mequon, WI 53092

Steven M Biskupic

Attorney at Biskupic & Jacobs SC

1045 W Glen Oaks Ln - Ste 106

Mequon, WI 53092

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Counterclaim re #9 filed by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Dykeman, Stephanie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Mary Clare Polewski. (Eisenmann, Vanessa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand filed by Mary Clare Polewski . (Eisenmann, Vanessa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2021 09:00 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 4/6/2021. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-636-3807 and enter access code 3289363# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/26/2021. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen. Dries for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mary Clare Polewski. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Eisenmann, Vanessa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa K Eisenmann on behalf of Mary Clare Polewski. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven M. Biskupic and Vanessa K. Eisenmann (Eisenmann, Vanessa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dykeman, Stephanie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Mary Clare Polewski. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dykeman, Stephanie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company (Dykeman, Stephanie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Mary Clare Polewski by The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3729283)(Dykeman, Stephanie)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cincinnati Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie L. Dykeman