This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2022 at 09:23:56 (UTC).

The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 The Cincinnati Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against National Railroad Passenger Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Defendants

National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak

BNSF Railway Company

MS Contracting, LLC

Michael Sattman

Tiffannie M. Kennedy

Joseph Michael Hoffman

Mariano Rodriguez

Chariton County, Missouri

Janet Williams

David Williams

Brian Marra

Christopher Marzullo

Carilyn White

Anthony Bryant

Estevan Carreon

Jane Carreon

Matthew Campagna

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael L. Brown

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP - Kansas City

800 E 101St Terrace, Suite 350

Kansas City, MO 64131

Ericka Hammett

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP - Milwaukee

250 E. Wisconsin Ave, Ste 800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Timothy Austin Pullin

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP - Kansas City

800 E 101St Terrace, Suite 350

Kansas City, MO 64131

Defendant Attorneys

Sean P. Hamer

Attorney at SCHARNHORST AST PC - Kansas City

1100 Walnut Street, Suite 1950

Kansas City, MO 64106

Alex A. McKenna

Attorney at SCHAMHORST AST PC

1100 Walnut Street, Suite 1950

Kansas City, MO 64106

Kelly Elizabeth Lynch Murphy

Attorney at SCHARNHORST AST PC - Kansas City

1100 Walnut Street, Suite 1950

Kansas City, MO 64106

Paula L. Brown

Attorney at SCHARNHORST AST PC - Kansas City 2

1100 Walnut, Suite 1950

Kansas City, MO 64106

Scott R. Ast

Attorney at SCHARNHORST AST PC - Kansas City 2

1100 Walnut, Suite 1950

Kansas City, MO 64106

Burke Robinson

Attorney at LONG AND ROBINSON LLC

1800 Baltimore Avenue, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108

John J. Gates

Attorney at GATES WESTERING LLC

701 E. 63Rd St., Suite 350

Kansas City, MO 64110

Jonathan Samuel Jones

Attorney at SCHLICHTER BOGARD LLP

100 S. Fourth St., Suite 1200

St. Louis, MO 63102

Other Attorneys

Grant L. Davis

Attorney at DAVIS AND BETHUNE

1100 Main Street, 2930 City Center Square

Kansas City, MO 64105

Samuel M. Wendt

Attorney at WENDT LAW FIRM PC

4717 Grand Avenue, Suite 130

Kansas City, MO 64112

Benjamin Tyler Friesen

Attorney at KUCKELMAN TORLINE

10740 Nall, Suite 250

Overland Park, KS 66211

Michael J. Kuckelman

Attorney at KUCKELMAN TORLINE

10740 Nall, Suite 250

Overland Park, KS 66211

Stephen J. Torline

Attorney at KUCKELMAN TORLINE

10740 Nall, Suite 250

Overland Park, KS 66211

Nathan L Karlin

Attorney at POTTROFF AND KARLIN LLC

320 Sunset Avenue

Manhattan, KS 66502

 

Court Documents

#113

(#113) ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this matter is REMANDED to the Ninth Circuit Court in Chariton County, State of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/14/2022. (KCD) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#112

(#112) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motions to Remand (ECF Nos. #57 , #64 , #69 , and #85 ) are GRANTED. This matter shall be remanded to the Ninth Circuit of Missouri in Chariton County, Missouri for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/14/2022. (KCD) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#111

(#111) RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #85 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #57 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#110

(#110) ENTRY of Appearance by John J. Gates for Defendants MS Contracting, LLC, Michael Sattman. (Gates, John) (Main Document 110 replaced on 11/9/2022) (TMT). (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#109

(#109) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant MS Contracting, LLC, Michael E. Sattman and Abby D. Sattman, Trustees of the Michael E. Sattman and Abby D. Sattman Revocable Trust Agreement dated November 15, 2010, Citizens of Missouri. (Robinson, Burke) Modified on 11/21/2022 (CBL). (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#85

(#111) RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #85 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #57 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#69

(#111) RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #85 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #57 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#64

(#111) RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #85 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #57 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#57

(#111) RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #85 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #57 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporation, American Premier Underwriters, Inc., BNSF Railway Company, Canadian Pacific Railway, Canadian National Railway Company, United States Department of Transportation.. (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

3 #2

Exhibit Complaint

3 #1

Exhibit Policy Information

3 #3

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corp. a/k/a Amtrak Sent To: Plaintiff (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

1 #3

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

*Restricted*

1 #1

Main Document

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that this matter is REMANDED to the Ninth Circuit Court in Chariton County, State of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/14/2022. (KCD) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motions to Remand (ECF Nos. #57 , #64 , #69 , and #85 ) are GRANTED. This matter shall be remanded to the Ninth Circuit of Missouri in Chariton County, Missouri for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/14/2022. (KCD) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #85 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #57 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 9th Judicial Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, #69 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Chariton County filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) ENTRY of Appearance by John J. Gates for Defendants MS Contracting, LLC, Michael Sattman. (Gates, John) (Main Document 110 replaced on 11/9/2022) (TMT). (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant MS Contracting, LLC, Michael E. Sattman and Abby D. Sattman, Trustees of the Michael E. Sattman and Abby D. Sattman Revocable Trust Agreement dated November 15, 2010, Citizens of Missouri. (Robinson, Burke) Modified on 11/21/2022 (CBL). (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) ENTRY of Appearance by Burke Robinson for Defendants MS Contracting, LLC, Michael Sattman. (Robinson, Burke) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Kuckelman for Defendants Brandon Beggs, Nick Cook, Pauline Magin, William Magin, Brent Powers, Tiffany Powers. (Kuckelman, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company Janet Williams waiver signed on 10/13/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Brown, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2022 (TMT). (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company David Williams waiver signed on 10/13/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Brown, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2022 (TMT). (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company Laura Smalec waiver signed on 10/27/2022, answer due 12/26/2022. (Brown, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2022 (TMT). (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER CONCERNING JURISDICTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by October 24, 2022, Amtrak shall file an amended notice of removal that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of all parties to this action. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/17/2022. (KCD) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/18/2022) (TMT). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company Carilyn White waiver signed on 10/12/2022, answer due 12/12/2022. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CJRA ORDER (GJL): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen to District Judge Ronnie L. White. (Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings) (ANP) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Entry of Appearance: by Plaintiff The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Pullin, Timothy) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Docket(#5) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporation, American Premier Underwriters, Inc., BNSF Railway Company, Canadian Pacific Railway, Canadian National Railway Company, United States Department of Transportation.. (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JDC) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Chariton County, Missouri, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy Information, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(JDC) [CLERKS NOTE: STATE COURT PLEADINGS- SEALED PURSUANT TO LR 2.17 BECAUSE IT HAS THE FULL NAME OF A MINOR] Modified on 9/29/2022 (JDC). (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corp. a/k/a Amtrak Sent To: Plaintiff (Hamer, Sean) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Chariton County, MO, case number 22CH-CC00036, with receipt number AMOEDC-9533261, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by National Railroad Passenger Corp. a/k/a Amtrak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Hamer, Sean) [CLERKS NOTE: ATTACHMENT NUMBER 1 - STATE COURT PLEADINGS- SEALED PURSUANT TO LR 2.17 BECAUSE IT HAS THE FULL NAME OF A MINOR] Modified on 9/29/2022 (JDC). (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MS Contracting, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant

Latest cases where THE NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION is a litigant