This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2019 at 07:53:45 (UTC).

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. BONITZ, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BONITZ, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOE L. WEBSTER and WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00658

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

BONITZ, INC.

BONITZ FLOORING GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

F. WILLIAM DEVORE

Attorney at DEVORE ACTON & STAFFORD, PA

438 Queens Rd.

Charlotte, NC 28207

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. Answer due 08/01/2019. (DEVORE, F.) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (DEVORE, F.) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/15/2019) (Sheets, Jamie). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2601901.), filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY.(DEVORE, F.) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to BONITZ, INC., BONITZ FLOORING GROUP, INC. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. Answer due 08/01/2019. (DEVORE, F.) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (DEVORE, F.) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/15/2019) (Sheets, Jamie). (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to BONITZ, INC., BONITZ FLOORING GROUP, INC. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2601901.), filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY.(DEVORE, F.) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less