Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2021 at 11:20:24 (UTC).

The Chamberlain Group, Inc. v. Overhead Door Corporation et al

Case Summary

On March 10, 2021, The Chamberlain Group, Inc. (“CGI” or “Plaintiff”) represented byMichael Robert Rueckheim of Winston & Strawn LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Overhead Door Corporation (“Overhead Door”) and GMI Holdings Inc. (“GMI”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged patent infringement arising under the patent laws of the United States, Title 35 of the United States Code. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of US Patent Nos. 8,587,404 entitled “Movable Barrier Operator and Transmitter with Imminent Barrier Moving Notification,” (‘404 patent), 9,644,416 entitled “Barrier Operator Feature Enhancement,” (‘416 patent), 7,852,212 entitled “Alarm System Interaction with a Movable Barrier Operator Method and Apparatus,” (‘212 patent), 8,144,011 entitled “Alarm System Interaction with a Movable Barrier Operator Method and Apparatus,” (‘011 patent) (collectively “Asserted Patents”).

 

In the complaint, CGI alleged that “among its product offerings, CGI develops, manufactures, and sells the well-known LiftMaster® products, which have been recognized as the number-one brand of professionally installed garage door openers, as well as the acclaimed line of consumer-installed Chamberlain® branded products, which are present in most garages in America… CGI also offers its MyQ® technology for remote monitoring and control of the home and business, including garage doors, lights, and gates, both as a retrofit for most major brands of garage door openers and on LiftMaster® and Chamberlain® MyQ®-enabled product lines.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged upon information and belief that “Defendants make, use, sell, offer for sale, and/or import at least the following Accused Products that infringe the Asserted Patents. The Genie 7155 TKV and Overhead Door Destiny 1500 products are representative of Defendants’ accused barrier openers, and the Aladdin Connect and Overhead Door Anywhere Wall Controller and Door Sensor Kit are representative of Defendants’ accused non-integrated connectivity modules” and that “the Accused Products are being offered for sale by Defendants and their affiliates nationwide, including in the State of Texas and this judicial district. Continued sales of the Accused Products will further damage CGI’s hard-earned position and good reputation in the marketplace and irreparably harm CGI in other ways.”

 

There are four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the infringement of one or more claims of each of the Asserted Patents wherein it has been alleged that Defendants have infringed and continue to infringe Asserted Patents pursuant to  35 U.S.C.§ 271(a) in the Eastern District of Texas and throughout the United States by making, using, importing, offering for sale, and/or selling one or more of the Accused Products, which practice one or more of the claims of the Asserted Patents. 

 

In the prayer for relief the Plaintiff has requested the court to declare that the Asserted Patents are valid and enforceable and that the Defendants have wilfully infringed and are continuing to wilfully infringe Asserted Patents, have induced, and are inducing, infringement of the Asserted Patents and have contributed to, and are contributing to, infringement of the Asserted Patents. Further, the Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order for an injunctive relief and damages including lost profits, with interest and costs, and all other damages permitted by 35 U.S.C. § 284, including enhanced damages up to three times the amount of damages found or measured, but in any event no less than a reasonable royalty and costs of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Chamberlain Group, Inc.

Defendants

Overhead Door Corporation

GMI Holdings Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Robert Rueckheim

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Menlo Park

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

James Winn

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Chicago

35 West Wacker Drive, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

Michael Brett Johnson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Dallas

2121 N Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Eimeric Reig-Plessis

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Menlo Park

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Dillon Kellerman

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP - San Francisco

101 California Street, 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

James Travis Underwood

Attorney at Gillam & Smith LLP

102 N College, Suite 800

Tyler, TX 75702

Katherine K. Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Menlo Park

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant Attorneys

David K Callahan

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - Chicago

330 N. Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Scott Wayne Breedlove

Attorney at Deans Stepp Law, LLP

325 N. Saint Paul St, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201-3891

Nathan Isaiah Charles Cox

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David K Callahan on behalf of GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation (Callahan, David) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

21 #12

Exhibit 11 - Kayak.com Search Chicago to Dallas Non-stops

21 #6

Exhibit 5 - Defendants' Answer and Counterclaims

21 #5

Exhibit 4 - NDTX 2020 Complaint

21 #4

Exhibit 3 - Waiver of Service

21 #3

Exhibit 2 - NDTX Docket

21 #2

Exhibit 1 - NDTX Complaint

21 #1

Affidavit Tull Declaration ISO Motion to Transfer

#21

(#21) MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District of Texas by GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tull Declaration ISO Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1 - NDTX Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - NDTX Docket, #4 Exhibit 3 - Waiver of Service, #5 Exhibit 4 - NDTX 2020 Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Defendants' Answer and Counterclaims, #7 Exhibit 6- Kayak.com CLE to Dallas, #8 Exhibit 7 - kayak.com CLE to Dallas Non-stop, #9 Exhibit 8 - Kayak.com Search CLE to GGG, #10 Exhibit 9 - Kayak.com result for non-stop CLE to GGG, #11 Exhibit 10 - Kayak.com Search Chicago to Dallas, #12 Exhibit 11 - Kayak.com Search Chicago to Dallas Non-stops, #13 Exhibit 12 - Kayak.com Search Chicago to East Texas Airport, #14 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue)(Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit I

1 #12

Exhibit H

1 #11

Exhibit G

1 #10

Exhibit F

1 #9

Exhibit E

1 #8

Exhibit D1

1 #7

Exhibit C1

1 #6

Exhibit B1

45 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David K Callahan on behalf of GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation (Callahan, David) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District of Texas by GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tull Declaration ISO Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1 - NDTX Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - NDTX Docket, #4 Exhibit 3 - Waiver of Service, #5 Exhibit 4 - NDTX 2020 Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Defendants' Answer and Counterclaims, #7 Exhibit 6- Kayak.com CLE to Dallas, #8 Exhibit 7 - kayak.com CLE to Dallas Non-stop, #9 Exhibit 8 - Kayak.com Search CLE to GGG, #10 Exhibit 9 - Kayak.com result for non-stop CLE to GGG, #11 Exhibit 10 - Kayak.com Search Chicago to Dallas, #12 Exhibit 11 - Kayak.com Search Chicago to Dallas Non-stops, #13 Exhibit 12 - Kayak.com Search Chicago to East Texas Airport, #14 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue)(Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Sanwa Holdings Corporation for GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation. (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AFTER DEADLINE by The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Underwood, James) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Travis Underwood on behalf of The Chamberlain Group, Inc. (Underwood, James) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Defendants" ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation.(Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/19/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Overhead Door Corporation to 5/5/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for GMI Holdings Inc. to 5/3/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Overhead Door Corporation.( Cox, Nathan) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brett Johnson on behalf of The Chamberlain Group, Inc. (Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. Overhead Door Corporation served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. GMI Holdings Inc. served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Chamberlain Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Duchossois Group, Inc. for The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Robert Rueckheim on behalf of The Chamberlain Group, Inc. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8289493.), filed by The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit A1, #6 Exhibit B1, #7 Exhibit C1, #8 Exhibit D1, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GMI Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where OVERHEAD DOOR CORPORATION, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CHAMBERLAIN GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Callahan