This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2021 at 08:47:56 (UTC).

The Chamberlain Group Inc v. Overhead Door Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 The Chamberlain Group Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Overhead Door Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam R Cummings and David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00560

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sam R Cummings

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

The Chamberlain Group Inc

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Overhead Door Corporation

GMI Holdings Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Michael Rueckheim

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Dillon Kellerman

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street, 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

James Winn

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

M Brett Johnson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N. Pearl Street, Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Eimeric Reig-Plessis

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Scott W Breedlove

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

Nathan Isaiah Charles Cox

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/5/2021) (twd) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#18

(#18) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Answer or Amended Pleading. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sanwa Holdings Corporation for GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation. (Cox, Nathan) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

16 #2

Exhibit(s) A1 -- Infringement Chart

16 #1

Exhibit(s) A -- US9869120

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Additional patent/trademark or copyright numbers are added and the clerk should prepare the appropriate report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office to include registrations: US9869120., COUNTERCLAIM against The Chamberlain Group Inc filed by GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A -- US9869120, #2 Exhibit(s) A1 -- Infringement Chart)Attorney Scott W Breedlove added to party GMI Holdings Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Scott W Breedlove added to party Overhead Door Corporation(pty:dft) (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Dillon Kellerman (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11739304) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, M) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#10

(#10) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11739300) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Eimeric Reig-Plessis added to party The Chamberlain Group Inc(pty:pla) (Reig-Plessis, Eimeric) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

1 #15

Cover Sheet

1 #14

Exhibit(s) J

1 #12

Exhibit(s) H

1 #11

Exhibit(s) G

1 #9

Exhibit(s) E

1 #7

Exhibit(s) C1

1 #6

Exhibit(s) B1

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/5/2021) (twd) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Answer or Amended Pleading. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sanwa Holdings Corporation for GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation. (Cox, Nathan) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Additional patent/trademark or copyright numbers are added and the clerk should prepare the appropriate report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office to include registrations: US9869120., COUNTERCLAIM against The Chamberlain Group Inc filed by GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A -- US9869120, #2 Exhibit(s) A1 -- Infringement Chart)Attorney Scott W Breedlove added to party GMI Holdings Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Scott W Breedlove added to party Overhead Door Corporation(pty:dft) (Breedlove, Scott) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dillon S. Kellerman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/5/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eimeric Reig-Plessis. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/5/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Winn. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/5/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Vidal. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/5/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Dillon Kellerman (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11739304) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, M) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11739300) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Eimeric Reig-Plessis added to party The Chamberlain Group Inc(pty:pla) (Reig-Plessis, Eimeric) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11739283) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James Winn added to party The Chamberlain Group Inc(pty:pla) (Winn, James) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11739267) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M Brett Johnson on behalf of The Chamberlain Group Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Johnson, M) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketJudge David C Godbey reassigned as presiding judge per Special Order 3-287. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to the case. (ctf) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (oyh) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of AO120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by The Chamberlain Group, Inc. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Chamberlain Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Duchossois Group, Inc. for The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Rueckheim on behalf of The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation filed by The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11683622) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) A1, #6 Exhibit(s) B1, #7 Exhibit(s) C1, #8 Exhibit(s) D1, #9 Exhibit(s) E, #10 Exhibit(s) F, #11 Exhibit(s) G, #12 Exhibit(s) H, #13 Exhibit(s) I, #14 Exhibit(s) J, #15 Cover Sheet) (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GMI Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CHAMBERLAIN GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Wayne Breedlove