This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 08:32:19 (UTC).

The Chamberlain Group Inc v. Overhead Door Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 The Chamberlain Group Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Overhead Door Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

The Chamberlain Group, Inc

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Overhead Door Corporation

GMI Holdings Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

M Brett Johnson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N. Pearl Street, Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael Rueckheim

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

255 Shoreline Drive, Suite 520

Redwood City, CA 94065

Eimeric Reig-Plessis

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Menlo Park

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

James Winn

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Chicago

35 West Wacker Drive, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

Katherine Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

255 Shoreline Drive, Suite 520

Redwood City, CA 94065

Michael Robert Rueckheim

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Redwood City

255 Shoreline Drive, Ste 520

Redwood City, CA 94065

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Scott W Breedlove

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

David K Callahan

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - Chicago

330 N. Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Kenneth G. Schuler

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - Chicago

330 N. Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Marc N. Zubick

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Michael C Smith

Attorney at Scheef & Stone, LLP

113 East Austin Street

Marshall, TX 75670

Nathan Isaiah Charles Cox

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N. Central Expressway, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#58

(#58) ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine Vidal terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/7/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

57 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#57

(#57) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Katherine Vidal by The Chamberlain Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#56

(#56) ORDER - The Court issues this Order sua sponte. Chamberlains affirmative claims of infringement of the Asserted Patents, and Defendants counterclaims of non-infringement and invalidity of the same, areSEVERED from this action and CONSOLIDATED with Case No. 2:21-CV-00084-JRG to be tried as part of the March 7, 2022 jury trial in that case; Defendants counterclaim of infringement with respect to U.S. Patent No. 9,869,120 is SEVERED into a new action and All pending motions in the above-captioned case are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/2/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

55 #1

*Restricted*

#55

(#55) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00560. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#54

(#54) ORDER: Because this case substantially overlaps with another case filed earlier in the Eastern District of Texas, the Court transfers the case to the Eastern District of Texas, Marshall Division pursuant to the first to file rule. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/8/2022) (ygl) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 02/08/2022)

53 #5

Exhibit(s) E

#47

(#53) RESPONSE filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc re: #47 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E) (Rueckheim, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)

1 #14

Exhibit(s) J

1 #13

Exhibit(s) I

1 #12

Exhibit(s) H

1 #10

Exhibit(s) F

1 #8

Exhibit(s) D1

1 #6

Exhibit(s) B1

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine Vidal terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/7/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Katherine Vidal by The Chamberlain Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketSevered Civil Action 2:22cv65 (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER - The Court issues this Order sua sponte. Chamberlains affirmative claims of infringement of the Asserted Patents, and Defendants counterclaims of non-infringement and invalidity of the same, areSEVERED from this action and CONSOLIDATED with Case No. 2:21-CV-00084-JRG to be tried as part of the March 7, 2022 jury trial in that case; Defendants counterclaim of infringement with respect to U.S. Patent No. 9,869,120 is SEVERED into a new action and All pending motions in the above-captioned case are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/2/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to the case. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00560. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER: Because this case substantially overlaps with another case filed earlier in the Eastern District of Texas, the Court transfers the case to the Eastern District of Texas, Marshall Division pursuant to the first to file rule. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/8/2022) (ygl) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) RESPONSE filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc re: #47 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E) (Rueckheim, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) REPLY filed by GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation re: #43 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Callahan, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE of Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by GMI Holdings Inc, Overhead Door Corporation (Callahan, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11739283) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James Winn added to party The Chamberlain Group Inc(pty:pla) (Winn, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11739267) filed by The Chamberlain Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vidal, Katherine) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M Brett Johnson on behalf of The Chamberlain Group Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Johnson, M) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketJudge David C Godbey reassigned as presiding judge per Special Order 3-287. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to the case. (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of AO120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by The Chamberlain Group, Inc. (Rueckheim, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Chamberlain Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Duchossois Group, Inc. for The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Rueckheim, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Rueckheim on behalf of The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rueckheim, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against GMI Holdings Inc., Overhead Door Corporation filed by The Chamberlain Group, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11683622) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) A1, #6 Exhibit(s) B1, #7 Exhibit(s) C1, #8 Exhibit(s) D1, #9 Exhibit(s) E, #10 Exhibit(s) F, #11 Exhibit(s) G, #12 Exhibit(s) H, #13 Exhibit(s) I, #14 Exhibit(s) J, #15 Cover Sheet) (Rueckheim, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 2/9/2022.] (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GMI Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where OVERHEAD DOOR CORPORATION, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CHAMBERLAIN GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Callahan