This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2020 at 07:02:11 (UTC).

The Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. United States Department of Commerce

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 The Center for Investigative Reporting filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against United States Department of Commerce. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01783

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Center for Investigative Reporting

Will Carless

Defendants

U.S. Department of Commerce

United States Department of Commerce

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diana Victoria Baranetsky

Attorney at The Center for Investigative Reporting

1400 65Th Street, Suite 200

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendant Attorney

Jevechius Doherty Bernardoni

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Avenue, P.O. Box 36055

San Francisco, CA 94102-3495

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #9 Stipulation To Set Response Date. Deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 5/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/11/2020 is reset to 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Commerce.. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO SET RESPONSE DATE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by United States Department of Commerce. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Will Carless, The Center for Investigative Reporting re #1 Complaint, (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Will Carless, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Department of Commerce. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Will Carless & The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Commerce, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 14275379). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting & Will Carless. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) Modified on 3/13/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #9 Stipulation To Set Response Date. Deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 5/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/11/2020 is reset to 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Commerce.. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO SET RESPONSE DATE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by United States Department of Commerce. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Will Carless, The Center for Investigative Reporting re #1 Complaint, (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Will Carless, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Department of Commerce. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/26/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Will Carless & The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Commerce, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 14275379). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting & Will Carless. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) Modified on 3/13/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less