This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2020 at 07:07:32 (UTC).

The Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. United States Department of the Treasury

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 The Center for Investigative Reporting filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against United States Department of the Treasury. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08181

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Center for Investigative Reporting

Aaron Glantz

Defendants

Treasury, Dept of

United States Department of the Treasury

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diana Victoria Baranetsky

Attorney at The Center for Investigative Reporting

1400 65Th Street, Suite 200

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendant Attorney

John Wesley Samples

Attorney at The United States Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Avenue, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING re #10 Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which to Answer filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Aaron Glantz, United States Department of the Treasury. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER filed by United States Department of the Treasury, The Center for Investigative Reporting and Aaron Glantz. (Samples, John) (Filed on 1/24/2020) Modified on 1/27/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John Wesley Samples (Samples, John) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Treasury. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of the Treasury (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13985079.). Filed by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING re #10 Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which to Answer filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, Aaron Glantz, United States Department of the Treasury. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER filed by United States Department of the Treasury, The Center for Investigative Reporting and Aaron Glantz. (Samples, John) (Filed on 1/24/2020) Modified on 1/27/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John Wesley Samples (Samples, John) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Treasury. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of the Treasury (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13985079.). Filed by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TREASURY DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Wesley Samples