This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 07:34:08 (UTC).

The Booth Family Trust v. Vounatsos et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 The Booth Family Trust filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Vounatsos. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Angel Kelley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10209

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Angel Kelley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Booth Family Trust

Defendants

Michel Vounatsos

Stelios Papadopoulos

Alexander J Denner

Carolina D. Dorsa

Jesus B. Mantas

William A. Hawkins

Nancy L. Leaming

Richard C. Mulligan

Brian S. Posner

Eric K. Rowinsky

Stephen A. Sherwin

Biogen Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Theodore M. Hess-Mahan

Attorney at Hutchings, Barsamian, Mandelcorn, LLP

110 Cedar Street, Suite 250

Wellesley Hills, MA 02481

David C. Katz

Attorney at WeissLaw LLP

305 Broadway, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10007

Joshua M. Rubin

Attorney at WeissLaw LLP

305 Broadway, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10007

Mark D. Smilow

Attorney at Weiss & Yourman

551 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10076

Defendant Attorneys

James R. Carroll

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

500 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116

Michael S. Hines

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

500 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116

Yaw Anim

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

500 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Certification of Good Standing

25 #25

Main Document

24 #1

Certification of Good Standing

24 #24

Main Document

22 #1

Certification of Good Standing

22 #22

Main Document

#20

(#20) Joint MOTION And Stipulation For Order Regarding Response To Complaint by Biogen Inc., Alexander J Denner, Carolina D. Dorsa, William A. Hawkins, Nancy L. Leaming, Jesus B. Mantas, Richard C. Mulligan, Stelios Papadopoulos, Brian S. Posner, Eric K. Rowinsky, Stephen A. Sherwin, Michel Vounatsos.(Carroll, James) Modified on 3/17/2022 (Lara, Miguel). (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#19

(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Biogen Inc.. (Carroll, James) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Yaw Anim on behalf of Biogen Inc., Alexander J Denner, Carolina D. Dorsa, William A. Hawkins, Nancy L. Leaming, Jesus B. Mantas, Richard C. Mulligan, Stelios Papadopoulos, Brian S. Posner, Eric K. Rowinsky, Stephen A. Sherwin, Michel Vounatsos (Anim, Yaw) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Alexander J Denner waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Stelios Papadopoulos waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Michel Vounatsos waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Biogen Inc. waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Biogen Inc., Alexander J Denner, Carolina D. Dorsa, William A. Hawkins, Nancy L. Leaming, Jesus B. Mantas, Richard C. Mulligan, Stelios Papadopoulos, Brian S. Posner, Eric K. Rowinsky, Stephen A. Sherwin, Michel Vounatsos. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

1 #3

Category Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Plaintiff's Verification

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joshua M. Rubin and Mark D. Smilow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney.; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joshua M. Rubin and Mark D. Smilow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark D. Smilow Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9241564 by The Booth Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Good Standing)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joshua M. Rubin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9241545 by The Booth Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Good Standing)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Corey Katz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David C. Katz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9236552 by The Booth Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Good Standing)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. All Defendants shall answer or file a responsive pleading by 5/23/22. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MOTION And Stipulation For Order Regarding Response To Complaint by Biogen Inc., Alexander J Denner, Carolina D. Dorsa, William A. Hawkins, Nancy L. Leaming, Jesus B. Mantas, Richard C. Mulligan, Stelios Papadopoulos, Brian S. Posner, Eric K. Rowinsky, Stephen A. Sherwin, Michel Vounatsos.(Carroll, James) Modified on 3/17/2022 (Lara, Miguel). (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Biogen Inc.. (Carroll, James) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Yaw Anim on behalf of Biogen Inc., Alexander J Denner, Carolina D. Dorsa, William A. Hawkins, Nancy L. Leaming, Jesus B. Mantas, Richard C. Mulligan, Stelios Papadopoulos, Brian S. Posner, Eric K. Rowinsky, Stephen A. Sherwin, Michel Vounatsos (Anim, Yaw) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Hines on behalf of Biogen Inc., Alexander J Denner, Carolina D. Dorsa, William A. Hawkins, Nancy L. Leaming, Jesus B. Mantas, Richard C. Mulligan, Stelios Papadopoulos, Brian S. Posner, Eric K. Rowinsky, Stephen A. Sherwin, Michel Vounatsos (Hines, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Nancy L. Leaming waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. William A. Hawkins waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Carolina D. Dorsa waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Alexander J Denner waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Stelios Papadopoulos waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Michel Vounatsos waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Booth Family Trust. Biogen Inc. waiver sent on 2/23/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Biogen Inc., Alexander J Denner, Carolina D. Dorsa, William A. Hawkins, Nancy L. Leaming, Jesus B. Mantas, Richard C. Mulligan, Stelios Papadopoulos, Brian S. Posner, Eric K. Rowinsky, Stephen A. Sherwin, Michel Vounatsos. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9176648 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by The Booth Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Booth Family Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Biogen Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yaw Asare Anim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Hines