This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2020 at 14:24:08 (UTC).

The Beloved Church et al v. Pritzker et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 The Beloved Church filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Pritzker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Z. Lee and Iain D. Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-50153

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

Referral Judge

Iain D. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Beloved Church

Stephen Cassell

Defendants

David Snyders

Steve Schaible

Craig Beintema

Jay Robert Pritzker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Christopher Breen

Attorney at Thomas More Society

309 W Washington St Ste 1250

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin J. Whittaker

Attorney at Thomas More Society

309 West Washintgon, Suite 1250

Chicago, IL 60606

Thomas L. Brejcha, Jr.

Attorney at Thomas More Society

19 South Lasalle Street, Suite 603

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Matthew Jacobi

Attorney at O'Halloran Kosoff Geitner & Cook, LLC

650 Dundee Road, Suite 475

Northbrook, IL 60062

Robert C. Pottinger

Attorney at Barrick Switzer et al

6833 Stalter Drive, 1St Floor

Rockford, IL 61108

Kevin Mark Casey

Attorney at Peterson, Johnson & Murray Chicago LLC

200 West Adams Street, Suite 2125

Chicago, IL 60606

Paul A O'Grady

Attorney at Peterson Johnson and Murray Chicago LLC

200 West Adams Street, Suite 2125

Chicago, IL 60606

Darron M. Burke

Attorney at Barrick, Switzer, Long, Balsley & Van Evera, LLP

6833 Stalter Drive

Rockford, IL 61108

Jennifer Lynn Turiello

Attorney at Peterson, Johnson & Murray Chicago LLC

200 W. Adams, Suite 2125

Chicago, IL 60606

Dominick L Lanzito

Attorney at Peterson Johnson & Murray - Chicago LLC

200 West Adams Street, Suite 2125

Chicago, IL 60606

Thomas A. Green

Attorney at Barrick, Switzer, Long, Balsley & Van Evera

6833 Stalter Drive

Rockford, IL 61108

Hal Dworkin

Attorney at Office Of Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph, 13Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60613

Christopher Graham Wells

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Illinois

100 W. Randolph St., 12Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Sarah Hughes Newman

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

R. Douglas Rees

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph Street, 12Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Kelly C. Bauer

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph St., 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#60

(#60) MOTION by Defendant Jay Robert Pritzker to stay pending appeal [unopposed] (Rees, R.) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#59

(#59) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Minute order #58 is stricken. A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 8/10/20 at 8:45 a.m. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw== In the event that any party has any objections to this order, an objection must be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the telephone conference. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report seven business prior to the status hearing. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#58

(#58) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court orders the parties to file a joint status report by July 21, 2020. The report, which shall be as concise as possible, shall address: (1) the progress of discovery; (2) the status of briefing on any unresolved motions; (3) for cases without any future court dates, an agreed proposed schedule for the next 60 days; (4) for cases that have future court dates, an agreed revised schedule if the current schedule needs revision; (5) a request for any agreed action that the Court can take without a hearing; (6) whether the parties believe a telephonic hearing or in-person hearing is necessary in the immediate future, and, if so, the issue(s) that warrants discussion. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#57

(#57) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#56

(#56) ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #46 ; USCA Case No. 20-1757. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#55

(#55) ORDER : The Court previously denied Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction requesting that the Court enjoin Governor Pritzker from enforcing his latest stay-at-home order of April 30, 2020. See 5/3/2020 Memorandum Opinion and Order, ECF No. 39 ("May 3 Order"). Having filed a notice of appeal, Plaintiffs now urge the Court to enjoin enforcement of Pritzker's order while the appeal is pending. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 62. As the Seventh Circuit has explained, the standard for deciding motions for injunctions pending appeal is no different "from that applicable to a motion to stay the district court's judgment." Cavel Int'l, Inc. v. Madigan, 500 F.3d 544, 547 (7th Cir. 2007). In turn, "[t]he standard for granting a stay pending appeal mirrors that for granting a preliminary injunction." In re A & F Enterprises, Inc. II, 742 F.3d 763, 766 (7th Cir. 2014) (citation omitted). That means that courts "consider the moving party's likelihood of success on the merits, the irreparable harm that will result to each side if the stay is granted or denied in error, and whether the public interest favors one side or the other." Id. Given that the same standard applies, and that Plaintiffs have failed to introduce any new facts or arguments in support of the present motion, the Court denies Plaintiffs' request for an injunction pending appeal for the reasons explained in the May 3 Order denying Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/6/20. Mailed notice(ca, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#54

(#54) TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #46 . (jp, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#52

(#52) RESPONSE by Steve Schaible to MOTION by Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved ChurchInjunction Pending Appeal #47 (O'Grady, Paul) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#46

(#54) TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #46 . (jp, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church by Peter Christopher Breen (Breen, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church by Martin J. Whittaker (Whittaker, Martin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church by Martin J. Whittaker (Whittaker, Martin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Whittaker, Martin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Stephen Cassell; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16976245. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Whittaker, Martin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MOTION by Defendant Jay Robert Pritzker to stay pending appeal [unopposed] (Rees, R.) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Minute order #58 is stricken. A telephonic initial status hearing is set for 8/10/20 at 8:45 a.m. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw== In the event that any party has any objections to this order, an objection must be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the telephone conference. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report seven business prior to the status hearing. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court orders the parties to file a joint status report by July 21, 2020. The report, which shall be as concise as possible, shall address: (1) the progress of discovery; (2) the status of briefing on any unresolved motions; (3) for cases without any future court dates, an agreed proposed schedule for the next 60 days; (4) for cases that have future court dates, an agreed revised schedule if the current schedule needs revision; (5) a request for any agreed action that the Court can take without a hearing; (6) whether the parties believe a telephonic hearing or in-person hearing is necessary in the immediate future, and, if so, the issue(s) that warrants discussion. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #46 ; USCA Case No. 20-1757. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER : The Court previously denied Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction requesting that the Court enjoin Governor Pritzker from enforcing his latest stay-at-home order of April 30, 2020. See 5/3/2020 Memorandum Opinion and Order, ECF No. 39 ("May 3 Order"). Having filed a notice of appeal, Plaintiffs now urge the Court to enjoin enforcement of Pritzker's order while the appeal is pending. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 62. As the Seventh Circuit has explained, the standard for deciding motions for injunctions pending appeal is no different "from that applicable to a motion to stay the district court's judgment." Cavel Int'l, Inc. v. Madigan, 500 F.3d 544, 547 (7th Cir. 2007). In turn, "[t]he standard for granting a stay pending appeal mirrors that for granting a preliminary injunction." In re A & F Enterprises, Inc. II, 742 F.3d 763, 766 (7th Cir. 2014) (citation omitted). That means that courts "consider the moving party's likelihood of success on the merits, the irreparable harm that will result to each side if the stay is granted or denied in error, and whether the public interest favors one side or the other." Id. Given that the same standard applies, and that Plaintiffs have failed to introduce any new facts or arguments in support of the present motion, the Court denies Plaintiffs' request for an injunction pending appeal for the reasons explained in the May 3 Order denying Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/6/20. Mailed notice(ca, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #46 . (jp, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE by Steve Schaible re response to motion #52 (O'Grady, Paul) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE by Steve Schaible to MOTION by Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved ChurchInjunction Pending Appeal #47 (O'Grady, Paul) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) RESPONSE by Jay Robert Pritzkerin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved ChurchInjunction Pending Appeal #47 (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020. Mailed notice (jp, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee and referred generally to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM by Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church in support of motion for temporary restraining order, motion for preliminary injunction #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proclamation, 3-9-20, #2 Exhibit B - Proclamation, 4-1-20, #3 Exhibit C - EO 2020-18)(Breen, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church for temporary restraining order , MOTION by Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church for preliminary injunction (Breen, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church by Peter Christopher Breen (Breen, Peter) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church by Martin J. Whittaker (Whittaker, Martin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Stephen Cassell, The Beloved Church by Martin J. Whittaker (Whittaker, Martin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Whittaker, Martin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Stephen Cassell; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16976245. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Whittaker, Martin) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hal Dworkin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul A O'Grady(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Lynn Turiello

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin M. Jacobi