This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2020 at 07:03:35 (UTC).

The Arbitrage Fund et al v. Forescout Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 The Arbitrage Fund filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Forescout Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Illston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03819

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund

Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP

The Arbitrage Fund

Water Island LevArb Fund, LP

Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF

Defendants

Christopher Harms

Forescout Technologies, Inc.

Michael Decesare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc M. Seltzer

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6029

Andrew John Entwistle

Attorney at Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

280 Park Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Andrew J. Entwistle

Attorney at Entwistle & Cappucci LLP

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 1170

Austin, TX 78701

Vincent R. Cappucci

Attorney at Entwistle & Cappucci LLP

400 Park Ave

New York, NY 10022-4406

Andrew Mitchell Sher

Attorney at Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

299 Park Ave, Floor 20

New York, NY 10171

Brendan J. Brodeur

Attorney at Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

299 Park Ave, Floor 20

New York, NY 10171

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND REPUBLISH PSLRA NOTICE granting in part and denying in part (35) Motion to Consolidate Cases; dismissing (44) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:20-cv-00076-SI. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 7/7/2020) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP, Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund. Service waived by Christopher Harms waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020; Forescout Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020; Michael Decesare waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Entwistle, Andrew) (Filed on 6/25/2020) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Vincent R. Cappucci. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 19 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonz alez Rogers). Please update your personal profile on ECF Re: #19 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew M. Sher. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brendan J. Brodeur. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Vincent R. Cappucci. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew J. Entwistle. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Summons Issued as to Christopher Harms, Forescout Technologies, Inc., Michael Decesare. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Andrew J. Entwistle Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Krysta Kauble Pachman Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Marc M. Seltzer Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew M. Sher ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14564451.) filed by Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brendan J. Brodeur ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14564443.) filed by Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Vincent R. Cappucci ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14564438.) filed by Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew J. Entwistle ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14564411.) filed by Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, The Arbitrage Fund, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP -- None (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Christopher Harms, Forescout Technologies, Inc., Michael Decesare. Filed byThe Arbitrage Fund, Water Island LevArb Fund, LP, Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Comingled Master Fund LP, Altshares Merger Arbitrage ETF, Water Island Diversified Event-Driven Fund. (Filing Fee Paid $400.00 Receipt Number 0971-14564155) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 6/10/2020) Modified on 6/11/2020 (mbcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Forescout Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WATER ISLAND MERGER ARBITRAGE INSTITUTIONAL COMMINGLED MASTER FUND, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Arbitrage Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vincent R. Cappucci