This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2022 at 09:06:09 (UTC).

The Advantage of Advertising, LLC v. City of Opelika, Alabama

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 The Advantage of Advertising, LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Opelika, Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad W. Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00612

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Chad W. Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Advantage of Advertising, LLC

Defendant

City of Opelika, Alabama

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Franklin Lemond, Jr.

Edward Adam Webb

Defendant Attorneys

Allison Barrett Chandler

David J. Canupp

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER: the parties are hereby DIRECTED to complete and return the appropriate form so that it is received by the Clerk of Court on or before 12/30/2022, as further set out in order. Do NOT electronically file the reassignment form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 12/9/2022. (cwl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Opelika, Alabama re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

8 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#8

(#8) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to City of Opelika, Alabama; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(es, ) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (dft) City of Opelika, Alabama. (es, ) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) by City of Opelika, Alabama. (Canupp, David) Modified on 12/7/2022 (es, ). Modified on 12/8/2022 to correct motion event (am, ). (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (es, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. City of Opelika, Alabama waiver sent on 10/14/2011, answer due 12/13/2011. (Webb, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Case Assigned to Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan as presiding judge. (es, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (Webb, Edward) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

1 #15

Summons

1 #13

Exhibit 13 (1405 Geneva Street Appeal)

1 #12

Exhibit 12 (0 Cunningham Drive Appeal)

1 #9

Exhibit 9 (0 Gateway Drive Appeal)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 (0 Cunningham Drive Application)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 (0 Gateway Drive Application)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (1441 Gateway Drive Application)

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER: the parties are hereby DIRECTED to complete and return the appropriate form so that it is received by the Clerk of Court on or before 12/30/2022, as further set out in order. Do NOT electronically file the reassignment form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 12/9/2022. (cwl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER: GRANTING the #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan on 12/8/2022. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Opelika, Alabama re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to City of Opelika, Alabama; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(es, ) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (dft) City of Opelika, Alabama. (es, ) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) by City of Opelika, Alabama. (Canupp, David) Modified on 12/7/2022 (es, ). Modified on 12/8/2022 to correct motion event (am, ). (Entered: 12/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (es, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. City of Opelika, Alabama waiver sent on 10/14/2011, answer due 12/13/2011. (Webb, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Case Assigned to Honorable Judge Chad W. Bryan as presiding judge. (es, ) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (Webb, Edward) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against City of Opelika, Alabama ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3304262.), filed by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Sign Ordinance), #2 Exhibit 2 (1441 Gateway Drive Application), #3 Exhibit 3 (0 Gateway Drive Application), #4 Exhibit 4 (3300 Pepperell Parkway Application), #5 Exhibit 5 (0 Frederick Road Application), #6 Exhibit 6 (0 Cunningham Drive Application), #7 Exhibit 7 (1405 Geneva Street Application), #8 Exhibit 8 (1441 Gateway Drive Appeal), #9 Exhibit 9 (0 Gateway Drive Appeal), #10 Exhibit 10 (3300 Pepperell Parkway Appeal), #11 Exhibit 11 (0 Frederick Road Appeal), #12 Exhibit 12 (0 Cunningham Drive Appeal), #13 Exhibit 13 (1405 Geneva Street Appeal), #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Proposed Summons)(Webb, Edward) Modified on 10/14/2022 to add jury demand and text. (es, ). (Entered: 10/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less