This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 08:07:48 (UTC).

Thayer v. Vermont Department of Children and Families et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Thayer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Vermont Department of Children and Families. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is Geoffrey W. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00223

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Geoffrey W. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keziah Thayer

Defendants

Christopher Conway

Christine Johnson

Monica Brown

Vermont Department of Children and Families

John and Jane Does 1-10

Kenneth Schatz

Laura Knowles

Jennifer Burkey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colin R. Hagan, Esq.

Attorney at Shlansky Law Group, LLP

166 Battery Street, Suite 2

Burlington, VT 05401

David J. Shlansky, Esq.

Attorney at Shlansky Law Group, LLP

166 Battery Street, Suite 2

Burlington, VT 05401

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and MOTION for Protective Order filed by Keziah Thayer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Shlansky, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Proposed Order) (eh) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

1 #1

Affidavit of Keziah Thayer

3 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Monica Brown, Jennifer Burkey, Christopher Conway, John and Jane Does 1-10, Christine Johnson, Laura Knowles, Kenneth Schatz, Vermont Department of Children and Families filed by Keziah Thayer. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(law) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

2 #1

Declaration of David Shlansky

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

*Restricted*

2 #3

Proposed Order

3 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Keziah Thayer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Keziah Thayer, #2 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (unredacted, sealed), #3 Affidavit of Keziah Thayer (unredacted, sealed), #4 Proposed Complaint (sealed), #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

1 #4

*Restricted*

1 #2

*Restricted*

2 #2

Memorandum of Law

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting in part #2 MOTION for Protective Order for the same reasons stated in Document 7 . Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 1/14/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Entry dated 12/13/2019 re: issuance of waivers has been removed from the docket. (jlh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Entry has been removed from the docket. (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting in part #2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Use of a pseudonym is permitted but it must be clear to anyone reviewing the file that a pseudonym is being employed. Plaintiff may proceed at "K.T." If a journalist or member of the public files a request for disclosure, the court will consider the request at that time. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/13/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/13/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • (#5) CASE reassigned to Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. Plaintiff's counsel shall disregard the LR 73 Forms previously issued as moot. (law) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • (#4) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another judicial officer within the District of Vermont. (This is a text-only Order.) Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/3/2019. (hbc) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Monica Brown, Jennifer Burkey, Christopher Conway, John and Jane Does 1-10, Christine Johnson, Laura Knowles, Kenneth Schatz, Vermont Department of Children and Families filed by Keziah Thayer. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(law) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FILING FEE RECEIVED of $400.00. Receipt number 4682021761. (kac) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym and MOTION for Protective Order filed by Keziah Thayer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Shlansky, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Proposed Order) (eh) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Keziah Thayer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Keziah Thayer, #2 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (unredacted, sealed), #3 Affidavit of Keziah Thayer (unredacted, sealed), #4 Proposed Complaint (sealed), #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.