This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2021 at 08:27:27 (UTC).

Thakkar v. Good Gateway, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Thakkar filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Good Gateway, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04800

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Appellant

Chittranjan Thakkar

Sunny Isles Beach, FL 33160

Debtor

Nihan Developers, LLC

Appellees

Good Gateway, LLC

Clay Townsend

SEG Gateway, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

M. Denise Dotson

Attorney at M. Denise Dotson, LLC

170 Mitchell Street

Atlanta, GA 30303

Kelly L. Walsh

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

Julia Carole Hord

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

John Anthony Christy

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

Jonathan Akins

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 2/4/2021. (dgr) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Transcript for hearing held 10/27/2020) (Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

4 #9

doc 1465

4 #8

doc 1225

4 #7

doc 1222

4 #6

doc 1218

4 #5

doc 1201

4 #4

Case 15-58440 doc 1194

4 #3

Docket sheet

4 #2

doc 224

4 #1

Case 15-58443 doc 206

#4

(#4) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Case 15-58443 doc 206, #2 doc 224, #3 Docket sheet, #4 Case 15-58440 doc 1194, #5 doc 1201, #6 doc 1218, #7 doc 1222, #8 doc 1225, #9 doc 1465)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#3

(#3) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

1 #3

Docket Sheet

1 #2

Appealed Order doc. 206

1 #1

NOA doc. 212

#1

(#1) Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 15-58440-WLH. Notice of Appeal filed 11/23/2020 from Order entered 11/09/2020 by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. Fee Paid: No. filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. (Attachments: #1 NOA doc. 212, #2 Appealed Order doc. 206, #3 Docket Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/25/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 2/4/2021. (dgr) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Transcript for hearing held 10/27/2020) (Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Case 15-58443 doc 206, #2 doc 224, #3 Docket sheet, #4 Case 15-58440 doc 1194, #5 doc 1201, #6 doc 1218, #7 doc 1222, #8 doc 1225, #9 doc 1465)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid: $ 298.00, receipt number 1263469. (rsg) Modified to correct receipt number on 12/21/2020 (rsg). (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Chittranjan Thakkar re #3 IOrder. (dgr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, for IFP determination, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rvb) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Chittranjan Thakkar re #2 Order. (rvb) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 15-58440-WLH. Notice of Appeal filed 11/23/2020 from Order entered 11/09/2020 by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. Fee Paid: No. filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. (Attachments: #1 NOA doc. 212, #2 Appealed Order doc. 206, #3 Docket Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEG GATEWAY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M. Denise Dotson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Akins