This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 10:46:01 (UTC).

Thakkar et al v. ProctorU Inc

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Thakkar filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ProctorU Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02051

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrea Kohlenberg

Rutvik Thakkar

William Gonigam

Defendant

ProctorU Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carl Vincent Malmstrom

Attorney at WOLF HALDENSTEIN ADLER FREEMAN & HERZ LLC

Suite 1700, 111 W Jackson Blvd

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Michal Erin Crowder

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

Suite 1700, 1901 Sixth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35205

Thomas Julian Butler

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

Suite 1700, 1901 Sixth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Caleb Collins Wolanek

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

Suite 1700, 1901 Sixth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order

11 #1

Declaration of Dr. Ashley Norris

#11

#10

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Declaration of Dr. Ashley Norris

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue by ProctorU Inc. (Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant ProctorU Inc. Responses due by 5/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by ProctorU Inc. (Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Defendant ProctorU Inc. Responses due by 5/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Ashley Norris, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/6/2021 due to ECF Error.) (KE). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by ProctorU Inc. (Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant ProctorU Inc. Responses due by 5/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Ashley Norris, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/6/2021 due to ECF Error.) (KE). (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas Julian Butler on behalf of ProctorU Inc (Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/3/21. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/21 is CONTINUED to 5/28/21 at 9:45 AM. The Court will consider the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting after Defendant files its Motion to Dismiss. (TC) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Caleb Collins Wolanek on behalf of ProctorU Inc (Wolanek, Caleb) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by William Gonigam, Andrea Kohlenberg, Rutvik Thakkar. (Malmstrom, Carl) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/25/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 5/10/2021 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (DS) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: ProctorU Inc answer due 5/6/2021. (JMB) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/25/2021. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #4 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 5/6/21. (JMB) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Defendant ProctorU Inc. Responses due by 4/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crowder, Michal) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michal Erin Crowder on behalf of ProctorU Inc (Crowder, Michal) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to ProctorU Inc. and mailed to plaintiff's attorney for service (SKR) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against ProctorU, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3611258.), filed by Rutvik Thakkar, Andrea Kohlenberg, William Gonigam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malmstrom, Carl) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caleb C. Wolanek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. Butler