This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 10:35:22 (UTC).

Thakkar et al v. Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Thakkar filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04876

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Appellants and Debtors

Sugarloaf Centre, LLC

Chittranjan Thakkar

Sunny Isles Beach, FL 33160

Appellees

Lisa Wolgast

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP

Frank W. DeBorde

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Kelly L. Walsh

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

John Anthony Christy

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

Julia Carole Hord

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

M. Denise Dotson

Attorney at M. Denise Dotson, LLC

170 Mitchell Street

Atlanta, GA 30303

Jonathan Akins

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

Suite 800, 1100 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-4516

Appellee Attorneys

Lisa McVicker Wolgast

Attorney at Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

Frank William DeBorde

Attorney at Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Center, 3343 Peachtree Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1044

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#11

(#11) REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP. (Wolgast, Lisa) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. (adg) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. The Court, in its discretion, hereby ORDERS a temporary STAY of briefing [Doc. 6] pending the Courts decision on Appellees Motion [Doc. 7] to Dismiss. It is further ORDERED that, if any issues remain in this action following the Courts ruling on the Motion to Dismiss Appeal [Doc. 7], the Court will issue an Order at that time setting forth a revised briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/11/2021. (dgr) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

8 #1

Brief

#8

(#8) MOTION to Stay Briefing of Appeal with Brief In Support by Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Wolgast, Lisa) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

7 #1

Brief

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal with Brief In Support by Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Wolgast, Lisa) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 2/4/2021. (dgr) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

5 #46

doc1193

5 #36

doc1071

5 #35

doc1069

5 #31

doc1056

5 #27

doc1029

5 #26

doc1023

5 #25

doc1022

5 #19

doc994

5 #17

doc986

143 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Chittranjan Thakkar re #12 General Order. (rsg) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP. (Wolgast, Lisa) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. (adg) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Chittranjan Thakkar re #9 Order on Motion to Stay. (dgr) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. The Court, in its discretion, hereby ORDERS a temporary STAY of briefing [Doc. 6] pending the Courts decision on Appellees Motion [Doc. 7] to Dismiss. It is further ORDERED that, if any issues remain in this action following the Courts ruling on the Motion to Dismiss Appeal [Doc. 7], the Court will issue an Order at that time setting forth a revised briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/11/2021. (dgr) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay Briefing of Appeal with Brief In Support by Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Wolgast, Lisa) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal with Brief In Support by Morris, Manning and Martin, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Wolgast, Lisa) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 2/4/2021. (dgr) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 From case 15-58440 doc925, #2 doc934, #3 doc935, #4 doc936, #5 doc947, #6 doc953, #7 doc956, #8 doc959, #9 doc960, #10 doc965, #11 doc970, #12 doc971, #13 doc976, #14 doc981, #15 doc983, #16 doc984, #17 doc986, #18 doc989, #19 doc994, #20 doc1002, #21 doc1003, #22 doc1007, #23 doc1010, #24 doc1015, #25 doc1022, #26 doc1023, #27 doc1029, #28 doc1033, #29 doc1042, #30 doc1044, #31 doc1056, #32 doc1057, #33 doc1058, #34 doc1065, #35 doc1069, #36 doc1071, #37 doc1077, #38 doc1083, #39 doc1103, #40 doc1113, #41 doc1134, #42 doc1160, #43 doc1173, #44 doc1174, #45 doc1185, #46 doc1193, #47 doc1194, #48 doc1197, #49 doc1198, #50 doc1201, #51 doc1237, #52 doc1267, #53 doc1268, #54 doc1271, #55 doc1272, #56 doc1280, #57 doc1286, #58 doc1315, #59 doc1316, #60 doc1323, #61 doc1324, #62 doc1325, #63 doc1337, #64 doc1338, #65 doc1340, #66 doc1348, #67 doc1349, #68 doc1350, #69 doc1351, #70 doc1357, #71 doc1380, #72 doc1381, #73 doc1392, #74 doc1400, #75 doc1401, #76 doc1412, #77 doc1413, #78 doc1432, #79 doc1433, #80 doc1434, #81 doc1444)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 From case 15-58442 doc112, #2 doc114, #3 doc118, #4 doc120, #5 doc124, #6 doc125, #7 doc132, #8 doc133, #9 doc134, #10 doc143, #11 doc144, #12 doc145, #13 doc146, #14 doc148, #15 doc149, #16 doc150, #17 doc151, #18 doc152, #19 doc153, #20 doc154, #21 doc159, #22 doc161, #23 doc162, #24 doc163, #25 doc165, #26 doc166, #27 doc168, #28 doc169, #29 doc170, #30 doc172, #31 doc173, #32 doc174, #33 doc175, #34 doc176, #35 doc177, #36 doc178, #37 doc179, #38 doc181, #39 doc185, #40 doc186, #41 doc188, #42 doc193, #43 doc194, #44 doc195, #45 doc196, #46 doc199, #47 doc200, #48 doc201, #49 doc202, #50 doc224, #51 dc226, #52 docket sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Chittranjan Thakkar re #3 Order. (dgr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Chittranjan Thakkar re #2 Order. (eop) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 15-58442-wlh, filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. Notice of Appeal filed 12/1/2020 from Order entered 11/17/20 by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 1263365. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 207 - NOA, #2 Doc. 201 -Appealed Order, #3 Docket Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sugarloaf Centre, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa McVicker Wolgast