This case was last updated from PACER on 04/29/2020 at 13:53:37 (UTC).

Thai v. Curt Lewis & Associates LLC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Thai filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Curt Lewis Associates LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00528

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mai La Thai

Defendants

Curt Lewis & Associates, LLC

Curt Lewis & Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Paul Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorney

H Dale Langley, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of H Dale Langley Jr

1803 West Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STATUS REPORT filed by Mai La Thai. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Status Report due by 4/28/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/27/2020) (svc) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Curt Lewis & Associates LLC. (Langley, H) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Curt Lewis & Associates LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney H Dale Langley, Jr added to party Curt Lewis & Associates LLC(pty:dft) (Langley, H) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Curt Lewis & Associates LLC ; served on 3/6/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Curt Lewis & Associates LLC. (oyh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (oyh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Mai La Thai. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

1 #4

Copyright Form

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Curt Lewis & Associates, LLC filed by Mai La Thai. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10664467) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATUS REPORT filed by Mai La Thai. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Status Report due by 4/28/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/27/2020) (svc) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Curt Lewis & Associates LLC. (Langley, H) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Curt Lewis & Associates LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney H Dale Langley, Jr added to party Curt Lewis & Associates LLC(pty:dft) (Langley, H) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Curt Lewis & Associates LLC ; served on 3/6/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Curt Lewis & Associates LLC. (oyh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (oyh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Mai La Thai. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Curt Lewis & Associates, LLC filed by Mai La Thai. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10664467) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less