This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:59:48 (UTC).

Thacker v. ManpowerGroup US, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Thacker filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ManpowerGroup US, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jason K. Pulliam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00041

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

April Thacker

Defendant

ManpowerGroup US, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas B. Welmaker

Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly L. Kauffman

Nicole Susanne LeFave

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by April Thacker. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by April Thacker. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (bot2) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to ManpowerGroup US, Inc.. (mgr) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Nicole Susanne LeFave added to party ManpowerGroup US, Inc.(pty:dft) by ManpowerGroup US, Inc..(LeFave, Nicole) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

#7

(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ManpowerGroup US, Inc.. (LeFave, Nicole) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ManpowerGroup US, Inc.. (LeFave, Nicole) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Nicole Susanne LeFave added to party ManpowerGroup US, Inc.(pty:dft) by ManpowerGroup US, Inc..(LeFave, Nicole) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to ManpowerGroup US, Inc.. (mgr) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (bot2) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by April Thacker. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by April Thacker. (Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16942310), filed by April Thacker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welmaker, Douglas) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less