This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 09:39:01 (UTC).

Texoma Destinations, LLC, et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Texoma Destinations, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00266

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TEXOMA DESTINATIONS, LLC

CORNERSTONE MARINE GROUP, LP

Cornerstone Marine Group, LP doing business as Lighthouse Resort and Marina

Defendant

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Cleveland Wynne

Attorney at Nall Pelley & Wynne LLP

707 W Washington, P.O. Box 2228

Sherman, TX 75091-2228

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Andrew Melendi

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi LLP

2811 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 250 West

Dallas, TX 75204

Matthew Patrick Rigney

Attorney at Tollefson Bradley Mitchell & Melendi LLP

2811 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 250 West

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) First Amended ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wynne, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mem, ). (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#8

(#8) Submission of Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines by Texoma Destinations, LLC . (Wynne, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Texoma Destinations, LLC Notice of Initial Disclosures (Wynne, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

6 #5

Exhibit Ex 5

6 #4

Exhibit Ex 4

6 #3

Exhibit Ex 3

6 #2

Exhibit Ex 2

6 #1

Exhibit Ex 1

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed by Texoma Destinations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5)(Wynne, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/18/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/13/2021. (mem) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/1/2021. (mem) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed by Texoma Destinations, LLC, Cornerstone Marine Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(mem) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDue to the Court's trial docket, the June 2, 2021 Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (No attachment.) (tls) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First Amended ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Melendi, Stephen) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wynne, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mem, ). (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Submission of Proposed Scheduling Order Deadlines by Texoma Destinations, LLC . (Wynne, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Texoma Destinations, LLC Notice of Initial Disclosures (Wynne, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed by Texoma Destinations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5)(Wynne, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/18/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/13/2021. (mem) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/1/2021. (mem) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(mem) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed by Texoma Destinations, LLC, Cornerstone Marine Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(mem) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mem) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company from Grayson County - 397th District Court, case number CV-21-0184. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8330705), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melendi, Stephen) (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/1/2021 with flatted pdf) (mem). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Rigney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Andrew Melendi