This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 05:10:43 (UTC).

Texas Truck Parts & Tire, Inc. v. Mt. Hawley Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Texas Truck Parts Tire, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mt Hawley Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03146

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Texas Truck Parts & Tire, Inc.

Defendant

Mt. Hawley Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ethan Graham Gibson

Attorney at Fulkerson Lotz LLP

4511 Yoakum Blvd, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77006-5821

Nicholas Michael Brown

Attorney at Fulkerson Lotz LLP

4511 Yoakum Blvd, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

Gregory Keith Winslett

Attorney at Quilling Selander et al

2001 Bryan St, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, filed.(Winslett, Gregory) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Texas Truck Parts & Tire, Inc., filed.(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 08:45 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23037031) filed by Texas Trust Parts & Tire, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, filed.(Winslett, Gregory) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Texas Truck Parts & Tire, Inc., filed.(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 08:45 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23037031) filed by Texas Trust Parts & Tire, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mt. Hawley Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Keith Winslett