This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 09:52:59 (UTC).

Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allianz Global Investors U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06074

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company

Defendants

Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America L.P.

Allianz Asset Management of America LLC

Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc.

Allianz of America Inc.

Allianz Asset Management GmbH

Allianz SE

PFP Holdings Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frederic Scott Fox, Sr

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (NYC)

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-05615-KPF. Document filed by Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ GLOBAL INVESTORS U.S. LLC, ALLIANZ GLOBAL INVESTORS U.S. HOLDINGS, LLC, ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA L.P., ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA LLC, PFP HOLDINGS INC., ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA HOLDINGS INC., ALLIANZ OF AMERICA INC., ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT GMBH and ALLIANZ SE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fox, Frederic) Modified on 7/16/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24798562)Document filed by Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05615-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 20-cv-5615. (jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frederic Scott Fox, Sr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Frederic Scott Fox, Sr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Frederic Scott Fox, Sr to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the incorrect class action code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-05615-KPF. Document filed by Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALLIANZ GLOBAL INVESTORS U.S. LLC, ALLIANZ GLOBAL INVESTORS U.S. HOLDINGS, LLC, ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA L.P., ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA LLC, PFP HOLDINGS INC., ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT OF AMERICA HOLDINGS INC., ALLIANZ OF AMERICA INC., ALLIANZ ASSET MANAGEMENT GMBH and ALLIANZ SE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fox, Frederic) Modified on 7/16/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allianz Asset Management GmbH, Allianz Asset Management of America Holdings Inc., Allianz Asset Management of America L.P., Allianz Asset Management of America LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. Holdings, LLC, Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, Allianz SE, Allianz of America Inc., PFP Holdings Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24798562)Document filed by Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust..(Fox, Frederic) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PFP Holdings Inc. is a litigant