This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2022 at 09:46:00 (UTC).

Texas Medical Technology, Inc. et al v. Amegy Bank of Texas

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 Texas Medical Technology, Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Amegy Bank of Texas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00244

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Texas Medical Technology, Inc.

Omri Shafran

Defendants

John P. Hernandez

Amegy Bank Of Texas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J Mytelka

Attorney at Greer Herz Adams LLP

One Moody Plaza, 18Th Floor

Galveston, TX 77550

Chelsi Marie Honeycutt

Attorney at Greer, Herz & Adams, LLP

2525 South Shore Blvd. Suite 203, Ste 209

League City, TX 77573-4481

Defendant Attorneys

Carlton Dalbey Wilde, Jr

Attorney at Crady Jewett et al

2727 Allen Parkway, Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77019

Kendall Valenti Speer

Attorney at Crady Jewett et al

2727 Allen Parkway, Ste 1700

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/9/2022 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amegy Bank Of Texas, filed.(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to John P. Hernandez, filed.(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Requests for Issuance of Summons re: #4 Summons - Request for Issuance, #3 Summons - Request for Issuance by Omri Shafran, Texas Medical Technology, Inc., filed. (Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Amegy Bank Of Texas served on 7/26/2022, answer due 9/26/2022; John P. Hernandez served on 7/26/2022, answer due 9/26/2022, filed.(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Omri Shafran, Texas Medical Technology, Inc., filed.(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amegy Bank Of Texas, John P. Hernandez, Zions Bancorporation, N.A., filed.(Wilde, Carlton) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amegy Bank Of Texas, John P. Hernandez, Zions Bancorporation, N.A., filed.(Wilde, Carlton) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Omri Shafran, Texas Medical Technology, Inc., filed.(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Amegy Bank Of Texas served on 7/26/2022, answer due 9/26/2022; John P. Hernandez served on 7/26/2022, answer due 9/26/2022, filed.(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Docket(#8) Summons Not Issued as to Amegy Bank Of Texas, John P. Hernandez due to Notice of Withdrawal of Summons filed on 7/26/2022. Attorney or Plaintiff notified by NEF, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Requests for Issuance of Summons re: #4 Summons - Request for Issuance, #3 Summons - Request for Issuance by Omri Shafran, Texas Medical Technology, Inc., filed. (Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to John P. Hernandez, filed.(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Amegy Bank Of Texas, filed.(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/9/2022 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(VanesaAranda, 3) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28465543) filed by Texas Medical Technology, Inc., Omri Shafran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Honeycutt, Chelsi) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Medical Technology Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMEGY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlton Dalbey Wilde, Jr