This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 09:42:49 (UTC).

Texas Campaign for the Environment et al v. DCP Operating Company, LP

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Texas Campaign for the Environment filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against DCP Operating Company, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Environment America, Inc. doing business as Environment Texas

Texas Campaign for the Environment

Sierra Club

Defendant

DCP Operating Company, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Scott Cox

Attorney at Environmental Integrity Project

1206 San Antonio St.

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Samia Broadaway

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

98 San Jacinto Boulevard, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701

Joshua B. Frank

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

700 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Jacob Scott Janoe

Attorney at Baker Botts, L.L.P.

300 One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Stay Case Joint Motion to Extend Stay by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Joshua B. Frank ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14669454) by on behalf of DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#7

(#7) CORRECTED MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Samia Broadaway ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14664966) by DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Samia Broadaway ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14664966) by on behalf of DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Samia Broadaway. (slt) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Joshua Frank. (slt) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 Violations After 12.21.2020

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 Proof of Mailing

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Intent to Sue

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14648098). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Environment America, Inc., Texas Campaign for the Environment, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Intent to Sue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Proof of Mailing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Violations After 12.21.2020, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Colin) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/31/2021) (slt). Modified to replace with flattened pdf on 3/31/2021 (slt). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION to Stay Case Joint Motion to Extend Stay by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #6 Samia Broadway's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Corrected Motion was filed. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Joshua B. Frank's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Frank has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Samia Broadway's Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Broadway has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)Motion to Amend/Correct entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Joshua B. Frank ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14669454) by on behalf of DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORRECTED MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Samia Broadaway ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14664966) by DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Scott Janoe Samia Broadaway ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14664966) by on behalf of DCP Operating Company, LP. (Janoe, Jacob) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Samia Broadaway. (slt) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Joshua Frank. (slt) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge David Counts. The Court ORDERS that all deadlines in the instant case be STAYED for SIXTY DAYS from this Order's entry. The STAY will be automatically lifted at the expiration of the SIXTY DAYS. No additional extension will be granted unless good cause is shown. The Court ORDERS the parties to file, on or before May 3, 2021, a joint status report. All relief requested in the instant Motion and not explicitly granted is denied. It is so ORDERED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(mas) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Environment America, Inc., Sierra Club, Texas Campaign for the Environment. (Cox, Colin) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14648098). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Environment America, Inc., Texas Campaign for the Environment, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Intent to Sue, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Proof of Mailing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Violations After 12.21.2020, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Colin) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/31/2021) (slt). Modified to replace with flattened pdf on 3/31/2021 (slt). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCP Operating Company, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Environment America is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Club is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob S Janoe