This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 15:44:27 (UTC).

Texarkana Independent School District et al v. Abbvie, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Texarkana Independent School District filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Abbvie, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcia A. Crone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00250

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Shepherdsville, KY

Texarkana Independent School District

Smith-Green Community Schools

Fort Wayne Community Schools

Elk Grove Unified School District

Penn-Harris-Madison School Corp.

Socorro Independent School District

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Allergan Sales, LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Impax Laboratories, LLC.

Mylan Institutional, Inc.

Actavis Elizabeth, LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

Actavis South Atlantic, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Mylan Specialty, L.P.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Warner Chilcott Company, LLC

51 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Lyle Coffman

Attorney at The Coffman Law Firm

505 Orleans, Suite 505

Beaumont, TX 77701

Mitchell A Toups

Attorney at Weller Green Toups & Terrell LLP

2615 Calder, Suite 400

Beaumont, TX 77704

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-197) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804 in re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation and assigned to the Honorable Judge Polster. (signed by Clerk of the Panel) (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8425788.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Coffman, Richard) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:21oop45080, filed 6/11/2021. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Ohio. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-197) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804 in re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation and assigned to the Honorable Judge Polster. (signed by Clerk of the Panel) (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (bjc, ) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8425788.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Coffman, Richard) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fort Wayne Community Schools is a litigant

Latest cases where Elk Grove Unified School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Specialty, L.P. is a litigant